Elhindi v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Elsiddig A. Elhindi
Defendant: State of California and California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2015cv00009
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/18, ORDERING this action DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/22/2017 ORDERING that the parties shall show cause, within 10 days,why monetary sanctions should not issue for failure to meet the joint mid-litigation statement deadline. The filing of a joint mid-litigation statement will discharge this order. (Hunt, G)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/8/2017 ORDERING the foregoing stipulation for order to substitute Geoffrey Richards, Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee, In re: Elsiddig Elhindi and Robin Jones, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, EDCA, Case No. 11-31916, as plaintiff in place of Elsiddig Elhindi, and to revise the caption, and good cause appearing. (Reader, L)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REVISED JOINT STIPULATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2017 ORDERING: the Joint Mid-Litigation Statement is due 11/17/2017, Discovery due by 2/16/2018, Last day to complete law and motion is 1/19/2018, Join Pretrial Conferen ce Statement is due 2/26/2018, Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/14/2018, and Trial is set for 4/23/2018. The order and directions of this court contained in its Scheduling Orders dated 12/17/2015, otherwise remain in full force and effect.(Becknal, R)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/28/17, ORDERING that Defendant's request to file its expert reports and the supportingdocumentation under seal is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/17 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment 37 is DENIED; A Status Conference is SET for 6/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. All parties, including the Bankruptcy Trustee, shall appear by counsel and be prepared to discuss the impact, if any, of the Trustees appearance on the Scheduling Order now in effect.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/20/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff Elsiddig A. Elhindi will submit to a medical/psychiatric examination, pursuant to FRCP 35 on 5/18/2017; Dr. Carroll will be designated as Defendant's expert witness and will prepare a report of his findings and conclusions which meet the requirements of FRCP 26(a)(2)(B), 35, and any other applicable rule. Upon receiving the report from Dr. Carroll, Defendant will deliver a copy of the report along with any additional reports regarding the findings of any psychological testing, to Plaintiff's counsel. Defendant will deliver all supplemental reports to Plaintiff's counsel as they become available. (Reader, L)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/2/2017 ORDERING that written discovery be propounded by 5/26/2017. ORDERING that the order and directions contained in the Scheduling Orders at ECF 19 , 26 remain in full force and effect. (Washington, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/12/2017 ORDERING that written discovery be propounded by 3/31/2017; ORDERING that the order and directions contained in the Scheduling Orders at ECF 19 , 26 remain in full force and effect. (Michel, G.)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/8/2016 ORDERING the court approves the following schedule extending relevant dates for six (6) months: Expert disclosure: June 27, 2017, Rebuttal Expert Dislcosure: July 27, 2017. The order and directions of this court contained in its Scheduling Orders dated December 17, 2015, and October 13, 2016, otherwise remain in full force and effect. (Becknal, R)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/16 ORDERING the Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 8/28/17 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26. Pretrial statements shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules 281 and 282, and the requirements set forth in the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, ECF No. 19 ; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 9/25/17 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26; and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order (ECF No. 19 ) is otherwise CONFIRMED. (Becknal, R)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/20/2015. Each party has consented to proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge as stated in 14 Joint Status Report. Clerk shall REASSIGN case to Honorable Allison Claire. Parties hereafter shall file all documents bearing case number 2:15-CV-0009 AC. All dates currently set before Judge England are hereby VACATED. (Marciel, M)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/3/2015 ORDERING 11 the Parties shall file a Rule 26(f) joint status report with the Court no later than 7/21/2015. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elhindi v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsiddig A. Elhindi
Represented By: Brice Phillip Hamack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?