Gibbs v. Peterson, et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gibbs
Defendant: MacComber, Roth, Baker, Reames, McCloud, Lopez, Jr., Johntson, Lopez, Schiller, Goodrich, Young, Prasinos, McAuiffe, Randy, Karla Peterson and M. Bobbala
Case Number: 2:2015cv00061
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/28/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 82 be granted. Defendants' amended motion for sanctions 79 be denied as moot. Defendants& #039; request for judicial notice 82 -13 be denied as unnecessary. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the complaint to identify the proper defendant as J. Johnston 87 at 52 be denied as moot. This case be closed without prejudice. Motions 79 , 82 , and 87 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/6/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 75 motion to compel and GRANTING plaintiff's 76 motion for extension of time to supplement his interrogatory responses. Plaintiff is required to fu lly respond to Interrogatory Numbers 12 and 14 of Defendant Prasinos's First Set of Interrogatories and Interrogatory Numbers 7 and 8 of Defendant Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories by November 20, 2017. Plaintiff shall also serve a verified copy of his original and supplemental interrogatory responses on defendants by 11/20/2017. The deadline to file any additional motions to compel discovery is extended to 12/7/2017 for good cause shown. The deadline to file a dispositive motion is extended to 1/3/2018 for good cause shown. (Yin, K)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/2017 ORDERING the documents submitted for in camera review are not required to be disclosed to plaintiff.(Yin, K)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/10/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 63 motion to compel, construed as a request for injunctive relief, is DENIED. Plaintiff's 66 second motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIE D in part. The motion is granted only to the extent that defendants are required to produce the assertedly privileged RVRs and medical reports for in camera review within 7 days of this order to ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Defendants' 65 motion to compel is GRANTED. Plaintiff is required to fully respond to Interrogatory Numbers 12 and 14 of Defendant Prasinos's First Set of Interrogatories and Interrogatory Numbers 7 and 8 of Defendant Johnson's First Set of Interr ogatories by 11/1/2017. Plaintiff shall also serve a verified copy of his original and supplemental interrogatory responses on defendants by 11/1/2017. The court sua sponte extends the deadline to file any additional motions to compel discovery to 11/16/2017. (Yin, K) Modified on 10/10/2017 (Yin, K).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/11/2017 ORDERING that the 48 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. All defendants other than defendants Johnson and Prasinos are DISMISSED. (Zignago, K.)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/27/2017 DENYING 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/01/17 ORDERING that defendant Johnson file his response to plaintiff's amended complaint within 14 days. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than defendant Johnson and Prasinos be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/17/17 ordering that plaintiff is granted 30 days within which to file a second amended complaint. If plaintiff elects not to file a second amended complaint within 30 days the court will direct defendant Johnson to file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint and recommend that all other defendants be dismissed. (Plummer, M)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/8/16 NOT ADOPTING 24 Findings and Recommendations and REFERRING this matter back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Washington, S)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/31/15 ORDERING Service is appropriate for defendants Johnson and Prasinos. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff 1 summons, 2 USM-285 forms, instruction sheet and a copy of the 4/17/15 second amended complaint to be completed and returned within 30 days. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than defendants Johnson and Prasinos be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/12/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Kenneth Gibbs and forward payment to the court until the balance i s paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Peterson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacComber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johntson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prasinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAuiffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bobbala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?