Barger v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Gary Dale Barger
Defendant: CDCR, Supervisor Trust Office, Rackley, Facility Captain and Appeals Supervisor
Case Number: 2:2015cv00073
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/22/15 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/15 ORDERING that the courts order filed April 7, 2015 (ECF No. 14 ) granting plaintiff leave to file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis is vacated Plaintiffs "Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce a Judgment" (ECF No. 8 ) and "Motion to be Heard on Retaliation" (ECF No. 15 ) are denied. Plaintiff shall, within 21 days from the date of this order, submit the appropriate fee of $400.00 ($350.00 filing fee plus $50.00 administrative fee). Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Dillon, M)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/7/2015 DISMISSING plaintiff's 13 application to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/24/15 ORDERING that 11 Motion to Proceed IFP is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barger v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dale Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor Trust Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facility Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appeals Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?