Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lori Beth Thompson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00167
Filed: January 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/20/2017 GRANTING 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERING attorney fees in the amount of $9,486.00 pursuant to the EAJ (Washington, S)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/3/2016 ORDERING that the defendant shall file a response to 24 motion not later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 14 days from the date defendant's response is filed. (Jackson, T)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 16 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Commissioner's 19 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. This matter is REMANDED under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), for further proceedings consistent with this decision. The Clerk shall enter judgment for defendant. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/27/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff's 5 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Cler k of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complain t and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/2/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal in proper form in 30 days. Plaintiff shall submit her renewed request to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the required filing fee, no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Beth Thompson
Represented By: John Vincent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?