Field v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Karen Field
Defendant: United States of America, California Franchise Tax Board, Roger Arrieta, Phillip J. Boyle, Francis G. Cameron, Jr., Kathryn L. Cameron, Vivian Demille, Sibylle Harris, Leslie Kloppenburg, Richard H. Lemmon, Katherine M. Lopez, William J. Lopez, Manyun Natsu, Paul Ochsner, Marie Ondrako, Gary W. Rogers, Maurice Sharp, Donna Sharp, Aurelio Villegas, Sr., Terry Villegas, Aurelio Villegas, Jr, Kenneth P. Walker, Inland Power & Light Co., Capital One Financial Corporation, DCM Services LLC and Chrysler Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2015cv00241
Filed: January 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 JUDGMENT in Favor of Plaintiff Karen Field, Trustee Of The Deshon Revocable Trust Dated November 20, 2008, First Amendment of Trust Dated January 29, 2009 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/8/2020. Plaintiff Karen Field, Trustee of the DeSh on Revocable Trust Dated November 20, 2008, First Amendment of Trust Dated January 29, 2009 is discharged of all liability with respect to the disputed funds that are the subject of this action; Defendants-in-interpleader, their agents, attorneys, or assigns are permanently enjoined from instituting any suit at law or equity, or action or proceeding of any kind whatsoever against Plaintiff with respect to the disputed funds; Plaintiff is awarded $32,787 in attorneys' fees, $2,655. 77 in costs, and $1,450 in trustee's fees, for a total of $36,892.77, and the Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to disburse $36,892.77 to Plaintiff from the money held on deposit in the Court's registry account; and Plaintiff is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice as to all claims relating to the disputed funds. (cc: Financial) (Krueger, M)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/6/2020 CLARIFYING 182 Order and ORDERING the Clerk of the Court to disburse $36,892.77, which represents the total amount of awarded attorneys' fees, costs, and trustee's fees, to Plaintiff from the money held on deposit in the Court's registry account. (cc Financial) (Huang, H)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/21/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 149 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court hereby AWARDS Plaintiff $32,787 in attorney fees, $2,655.77 in costs, and $1,450 in trustee's fees to be paid from the fund. (cc Financial)(Huang, H)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/27/19 GRANTING Ex Parte request for an extension of time. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to submit the declaration described in the Court's 12/18/19 174 no later than 1/16/20. Defendants may respond no later than seven (7) days from the date the declaration is electronically filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/2019 GRANTING 142 Motion for Discharge. The Court DEFERS ruling on 149 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff is DISCHARGED of all liability with respect to th e disputed funds; Defendants-in-interpleader, their agents, attorneys, or assigns are permanently enjoined from instituting any suit at law or equity, or action or proceeding of any kind whatsoever against Plaintiff with respect to the disputed funds ; Plaintiff is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to a submit a declaration that clearly identifies the total amount and description of charges related to each compensable task as well as the total amount of compensable expenses allotted to each attorney. The declaration shall be submitted no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Defendants may respond no later than 7 days from the date the declaration is electronically filed; and the remaining parties are ordered to file an updated Joint Status Report within 30 days of this Order. (Huang, H)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/2017 GRANTING 67 Motion For Account and To Deposit Interpleader Funds. The Court GRANTS Motion to Deposit Interpleader Funds and ORDERS Plaintiff to deposit all Trust funds into the registry of this Court within 14 days of the date of this Order; and The Court GRANTS Motion for an Accounting for the Trust from February 2014 to present, and ORDERS Plaintiff to produce an accounting within 60 days of the date of this Order. (cc Financial) (Washington, S)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/26/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to Amend 5 Complaint. Plaintiff Karen Field shall file Second Amended Complaint with 10 days. (Marciel, M)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER 35 for second extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2015. The United States shall have an extension of 14 days after Second Amended Complaint is filed and served upon them if Court grants plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint or 14 days after entry of Order denying Motion. (Marciel, M)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/15 ORDERING that the United States shall have an additional 60 days, until 7/3/15, to file a response in this matter. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Field
Represented By: Michael E. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Arrieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip J. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis G. Cameron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn L. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Demille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sibylle Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kloppenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Lemmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manyun Natsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ochsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Ondrako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelio Villegas, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelio Villegas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Power & Light Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCM Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?