December 15, 2022 |
Filing
231
AMENDED 229 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/14/2022 ORDERING that the Clerk DISBURSE the amounts to the claimants (see order for details) at the addresses noted in the 228 stipulation, which are current and may not be consistent with the Clerk's records. (Perdue, C.)
|
December 12, 2022 |
Filing
229
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/12/22 ORDERING that the Clerk DISBURSE the amounts to the claimants (see order for details) at the addresses noted in the stipulation 228 , which are current and may not be consistent with the Clerk's records. CASE CLOSED. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 12/12/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
|
August 3, 2022 |
Filing
221
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/2/22 GRANTING 220 Defendants William J. Lopez's and Manyun Natsu's second request for an extension of time to file a stipulation of settlement and joint motion to distribute funds. The parties are ORDERED to submit the stipulation of settlement and joint motion to distribute funds no later than 12/12/22. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 3, 2022 |
Filing
217
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2022 GRANTING 212 Motion to Substitute Genene R. Wells Kloppenburg as Trustee of the Leslie R. Kloppenburg Revocable Trust in place of Defendant Leslie Kloppenburg. (Huang, H)
|
April 29, 2022 |
Filing
209
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/28/2022 GRANTING 208 Ex Parte Application, EXTENDING to 8/8/2022, to submit the stipulation of settlement and joint motion to distribute funds.(Reader, L)
|
March 16, 2022 |
Filing
207
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/16/2022 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to DISBURSE $52,365.25 to the California Franchise Tax Board and $159,386.54 to the United States. (cc Financial) (Donati, J)
|
March 9, 2022 |
Filing
204
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/8/2022. The Court GRANTS the United States' 190 Motion to Determine Priority and to Disburse Interpleader Funds and CFTB's 196 Motion for Summary Judgment and Payment of Interpleade r Funds. The United States and CFTB are ORDERED to file updated documentation regarding the current amount due, including any accrued interest, no later than seven (7) days of the electronic filing date of this Order. The Court will disburse the u pdated amounts from the interpleader funds thereafter. Further, the remaining claimants are ORDERED to file properly noticed motions not later than sixty (60) days of the electronic filing date of this Order, including evidence showing they are en titled to disbursement from the remaining funds. These claimants are strongly encouraged to meet and confer regarding a joint Motion to disburse the remaining funds. Thereafter, the Court will disburse the remaining funds accordingly and close the case. (cc:CFS) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
April 8, 2020 |
Filing
188
JUDGMENT in Favor of Plaintiff Karen Field, Trustee Of The Deshon Revocable Trust Dated November 20, 2008, First Amendment of Trust Dated January 29, 2009 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/8/2020. Plaintiff Karen Field, Trustee of the DeSh on Revocable Trust Dated November 20, 2008, First Amendment of Trust Dated January 29, 2009 is discharged of all liability with respect to the disputed funds that are the subject of this action; Defendants-in-interpleader, their agents, attorneys, or assigns are permanently enjoined from instituting any suit at law or equity, or action or proceeding of any kind whatsoever against Plaintiff with respect to the disputed funds; Plaintiff is awarded $32,787 in attorneys' fees, $2,655. 77 in costs, and $1,450 in trustee's fees, for a total of $36,892.77, and the Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to disburse $36,892.77 to Plaintiff from the money held on deposit in the Court's registry account; and Plaintiff is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice as to all claims relating to the disputed funds. (cc: Financial) (Krueger, M)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing
184
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/6/2020 CLARIFYING 182 Order and ORDERING the Clerk of the Court to disburse $36,892.77, which represents the total amount of awarded attorneys' fees, costs, and trustee's fees, to Plaintiff from the money held on deposit in the Court's registry account. (cc Financial) (Huang, H)
|
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
182
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/21/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 149 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court hereby AWARDS Plaintiff $32,787 in attorney fees, $2,655.77 in costs, and $1,450 in trustee's fees to be paid from the fund. (cc Financial)(Huang, H)
|
December 27, 2019 |
Filing
176
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/27/19 GRANTING Ex Parte request for an extension of time. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to submit the declaration described in the Court's 12/18/19 174 no later than 1/16/20. Defendants may respond no later than seven (7) days from the date the declaration is electronically filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 20, 2019 |
Filing
174
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/2019 GRANTING 142 Motion for Discharge. The Court DEFERS ruling on 149 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff is DISCHARGED of all liability with respect to th e disputed funds; Defendants-in-interpleader, their agents, attorneys, or assigns are permanently enjoined from instituting any suit at law or equity, or action or proceeding of any kind whatsoever against Plaintiff with respect to the disputed funds ; Plaintiff is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to a submit a declaration that clearly identifies the total amount and description of charges related to each compensable task as well as the total amount of compensable expenses allotted to each attorney. The declaration shall be submitted no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Defendants may respond no later than 7 days from the date the declaration is electronically filed; and the remaining parties are ordered to file an updated Joint Status Report within 30 days of this Order. (Huang, H)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
104
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/2017 GRANTING 67 Motion For Account and To Deposit Interpleader Funds. The Court GRANTS Motion to Deposit Interpleader Funds and ORDERS Plaintiff to deposit all Trust funds into the registry of this Court within 14 days of the date of this Order; and The Court GRANTS Motion for an Accounting for the Trust from February 2014 to present, and ORDERS Plaintiff to produce an accounting within 60 days of the date of this Order. (cc Financial) (Washington, S)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/26/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to Amend 5 Complaint. Plaintiff Karen Field shall file Second Amended Complaint with 10 days. (Marciel, M)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
41
STIPULATION and ORDER 35 for second extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2015. The United States shall have an extension of 14 days after Second Amended Complaint is filed and served upon them if Court grants plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint or 14 days after entry of Order denying Motion. (Marciel, M)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/15 ORDERING that the United States shall have an additional 60 days, until 7/3/15, to file a response in this matter. (Kastilahn, A)
|