McCall v. Beard
Petitioner: Arthur McCall
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard
Case Number: 2:2015cv00329
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 1/25/17 ORDERING that McCall's filing at Docket No. 31 will be construed as a timely-filed notice of appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer McCall's Request for an Extension of Time to File a Certificate of Appealability at Docket No. 31 to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc: USCA) (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 1/13/2017 ORDERING the Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. ORDERING the Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Any further request for a COA must be addressed to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Washington, S)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/12/16 ORDERING that 25 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioners traverse, filed on March 25, 2016, is deemed timely.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?