Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Hunt et al
Plaintiff: |
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America |
Defendant: |
Kenneth W. Hunt and Karen M. Dunmore |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00336 |
Filed: |
February 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Garland E. Burrell |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/13/2017 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees, expert's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
|
October 13, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/17 ORDERING that Travelers' representative, Keith Flanagan, be allowed to telephonically attend the Settlement Conference at 9:00am on Tuesday, October 24, 2017, in Courtroom 25 before the Honorable Kendall J. Newman. Mr. Flanagan is instructed to call 5 minutes prior to the hearing into the conference line 1-888-363-4734 and use the access code 1245690 plus # and security code 4223 plus # when prompted. (Becknal, R)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
62
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/17, ORDERING that the parties' motions in limine are due no later than 5 p.m. on 11/6/2017. Responses are due no later than 5 p.m. on 11/13/2017. Replies are due on or before 11/20/2017. Trial is scheduled for Monday, 11/27/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/2016 ORDERING 45 The Pretrial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED so that the time for completion of discovery related to Sidney B. Dunmore, including times for taking depositions and time to move to compel against Sidney B. Dunmore, are EXTENDED to 12/30/2016; the Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged in all other respects. (Reader, L)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/16 DENYING defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/16/15 ORDERING that The Motion for Good Faith Settlement 29 is GRANTED. The Settlement was made in good faith within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure section 877.6; Hunt is en titled to the protections of Code of Civil Procedure section 877.6(c) et seq; and Any pending or future claims by any alleged joint tortfeasors or co-obligor against Hunt for equitable comparative contribution or partial, comparative, or equitable indemnity arising out of or relating to the Complaint and the allegations therein are barred. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/27/2015 ORDERING that the pending 10 Motion to Dismiss is deemed WITHDRAWN in light of the Notice of Related Cases filed by all parties on 4/29/2015. The dismissal motion can be re-noticed for hearing after a decision is filed on the Notice of Related Cases issue. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/27/15. Each party shall SHOW CAUSE no later than 5/1/2015 as to why a sanction should not be imposed for the failure to comply with LR 123. The Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 6/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Joint Status Report due no later than 14 days prior to Status Conference. (Manzer, C)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?