Zandie v. Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Ann Zandie
Defendant: Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP
Case Number: 2:2015cv00349
Filed: February 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/27/2015 GRANTING 16 Defendant's Request to appear by telephone at the 5/4/2015 motion hearing set for 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/6/2015 re 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and 11 Plaintiff's CROSS-MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The court will continue the 4/20/2015 hea ring to 5/4/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, in order to hear the cross-motions for summary judgment concurrently. Defendant shall file an opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion by 4/20/2015, and plaintiff shall file her reply by 4/27/2015. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/2/2015 DENYING without prejudice 9 Defendant's request to appear by telephone at the Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 4/20/2015. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zandie v. Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Zandie
Represented By: Rory Colin Leisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP
Represented By: Pamela Lorraine Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?