Olick v. Lily
Plaintiff: David R. Olick
Defendant: Vivian Lily
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 2:2015cv00410
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2020 DISMISSING this case without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (cc: Bankruptcy Clerk) (Huang, H)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 62 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/18/2019 resetting the Status Conference Re Divorce Proceedings and Final Pretrial Conference for 1/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is reset for 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2018 ORDERING that the jury trial is RESET to 9/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Status Conference re Divorce Proceedings and the Final Pretrial Conference are RESET to 7/22/2019 at 1:30 p.m. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/11/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 58 Stipulation, the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 1/7/2019 at 01:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb and the Jury Trial is RESET for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/18/17 ORDERING that the 02/14/17 trial date is VACATED and RESET for 10/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. All deadlines set in the Final Pretrial Order are adjusted based on the new trial date. (Benson, A)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/28/2016 CONTINUING the trial date to 2/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; ADJUSTING all deadlines set in the 30 Final Pretrial Order based on the new trial date. (Michel, G.)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 03/28/2016 ORDERING the Trial CONTINUED to 11/1/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Jackson, T)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER 35 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/6/2015 resetting the Jury Trial date for 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Deadlines set in the Final Pretrial Order will be adjusted based on the new trial date. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/12/2015 ORDERING the withdrawal of Stephen C. Ruehmann and the substitution of William J. Murray as sole counsel for Debtor/Defendant Vivian Lily is hereby APPROVED and so ORDERED. Attorney Stephen C. Ruehmann terminated. (Zignago, K.)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/31/2015 ORDERING that to the extent plaintiff's 15 motion for discovery sanctions seeks an order striking defendant's answer, plaintiff's motion is DENIED. To the extent plaintiff 's 15 motion for discovery sanctions seeks an order requiring defendant's compliance with a prior discovery order, plaintiff's motion is DENIED as untimely and without prejudice to plaintiff seeking an order reopening discovery from the assigned District Judge. (Zignago, K.)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 10 Motion to Strike. If plaintiff wishes to file a Motion to Compel Discovery or other Motion related to Discovery matters, he shall properly notice the Motion for a hearing before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd pursuant to L.R. 251. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olick v. Lily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Olick
Represented By: Richard A. Canatella
Represented By: David R. Olick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Lily
Represented By: Stephen C. Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?