Vodonick v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Vodonick
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00539
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/8/2020 ORDERING that the "Notice of Pending Litigation" recorded by Plaintiff John Vodonick on or about 3/11/2015, as document number 20150004964 in the Official Records of Nevada County is hereby expunged. A certified copy of this document may be filed in the Nevada County Recorder's Office. (Zignago, K.)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/2/2020 DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Amend the Complaint and GRANTING Defendant's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/10/20 AMENDING Scheduling Order as follows: deadline to file dispositive motions: 4/7/2020; hearing date for all dispositive motions: 05/05/20 at 1:30 p.m.; deadline to file join t trial statement: 07/24/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez and Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/30/2017 DENYING 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G.)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/1/2016. Court is GRANTING with PREJUDICE defendant Fannie Mae's 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to claims for relief three, four, five, and the part of the first claim for relief that seeks a Declaration that Vodonick is vested in fee title and interest in Neighboring Property. Court is DENYING defendant Fannie Mae's 13 Motion with respect to part of first claim for relief that seeks a Declaration that purported deed to Fannie Mae is NULL and VOID. (Marciel, M)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/12/2015 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 6 Motion to Dismiss to 9/16/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; ORDERING that all deadlines for the filing and service of opposition and reply briefs be calculated based on the new hearing date. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vodonick v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vodonick
Represented By: E. John Vodonick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?