Sears v. County of Butte, et al.,
Plaintiff: Michael Sears
Defendant: County of Butte, Butte County Sheriff's Office, Andy Duch and John Kuhn
Case Number: 2:2015cv00589
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/2018 ORDERING this action DISMISSED with prejudice. The matter having now been concluded in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/18/18 DENYING 53 Motion to Compel as untimely. (Benson, A.)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/7/18: Leave to re-depose plaintiff, Honea, Boyd, and Berry is granted. Leave to depose Ramsey and Alpert is denied. As to inquiry into any alleged misconduct, the court grants a limited protective order for all future depositions consistent with Perez v. City of Roseville, 882 F.3d 843 (9th Cir. 2018). (Kaminski, H)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/4/2018 concerning the discovery disagreements between the parties and the parties' request to shorten time to hear their discovery disputes. Hearing set for 6/7/2018, at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. All parties may attend telephonically. The parties to the dispute must submit their Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute not later than 10:00AM, on 6/6/2018. (York, M)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/18: Settlement Conference RESET for 8/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kaminski, H)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/30/18 ORDERING the new deadline to complete non-expert discovery is June 15, 2018; the new deadline to disclose expert witnesses is continued to August 3, 2018; the new deadline to complete expert discovery is October 5, 2018; All other provisions of the operative Pretrial Scheduling Order remain in effect. (Becknal, R)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/23/2017 CONTINUING the expert discovery deadline from 11/3/2017 to 4/13/2018. (Hunt, G)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/19/17 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 17 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/6/2017 ORDERING the parties to disclose expert witnesses within forty-five (45) days after the Court's decision on the pending 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G.)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/2/2017 ORDERING discovery deadline is CONTINUED from 2/13/2017 to 3/5/2017 for the limited purpose of taking Deputy Dan Angels deposition. (Washington, S)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/29/2016 GRANTING 15 Request to Extend Page Limit re Motion for Summary Judgment; ALLOWING the defendants up to twenty-seven (27) pages for their Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Summary Judgment; ALLOWING any opposition to said motion to be up to twenty-seven (27) pages in length; ORDERING that any reply not exceed fifteen (15) pages. (Michel, G.)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/17/2015. (Michel, G.)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/2/2015 ORDERING that the time for Defendants County of Butte, Butte County Sheriff's Office, Andy Duch and John Kuhn to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED up to and including 4/15/2015. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears v. County of Butte, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sears
Represented By: David P Mastagni
Represented By: Phillip Richard Atillio Mastagni
Represented By: Grant A Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Butte
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Duch
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kuhn
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?