Jackson v. California Board of Parole Hearings
Petitioner: Johnny Clifford Jackson
Respondent: California Board of Parole Hearings
Case Number: 2:2015cv00609
Filed: March 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 USCA JUDGMENT as to 24 Request/Motion for Certificate of Appealibility DENYING said Request for Certificate of Appealability; DENYING any pending motions as moot. (cc: Ninth Circuit) (Michel, G.)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/23/16 ORDERING that petitioner's 28 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/03/15 recommending that respondent's motion to dismiss 13 be granted; and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Motion to Dismiss 13 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/21/2015 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 12 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/24/15 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. California Board of Parole Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Clifford Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Board of Parole Hearings
Represented By: Andrew Robert Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?