Evans v. Southern California Intergovernmental Training and Development Center
Plaintiff: Tamara Evans
Defendant: Southern California Intergovernmental Training and Development Center
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America and State of California
Case Number: 2:2015cv00619
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/10/2018 EXTENDING the deadline for Discovery to 4/6/2018. (Hunt, G)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/25/17 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 27 is GRANTED. Claims four through six are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Because PlaintiffRelator's claims under the CFCA are barred as a matter of law, the dismissal is without leave to amend. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/27/17 ORDERING that the parties shall complete all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, no later than 1/6/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/5/17 ORDERING the case unsealed and served on defendants. The 1 Complaint, 22 Notice of Decline and this order shall be unsealed, all other previously filed content shall remain sealed. The Seal is LIFTED as to all other matter occuring in this action after the date of this order. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 1/6/2017 (Donati, J).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Southern California Intergovernmental Training and Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Anderson Berry(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Frederick W. Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Evans
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Intergovernmental Training and Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?