Harbor v. Cherniss et al
Plaintiff: Travyon C. Harbor
Defendant: Cherniss, O. Olmedo and Brian Duffy
Case Number: 2:2015cv00705
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 09/08/17 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Travyon C. Harbor on 10/19/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN & OTCD) (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/07/17 ordering plaintiff's 03/02/17 motion for sanctions 24 is denied. Plaintiff's 03/31/17 motion for contempt and sanctions 26 is denied. Plaintiff's 4/27/16 motion to strike 32 is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 04/12/17 ordering defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the second amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this order; and plaintiff's request for appointment of a GAL or counsel is denied. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/9/16 GRANTING 20 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Dillon, M)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Travyon C. Harbor signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/20/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbor v. Cherniss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travyon C. Harbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?