Williams v. People of the State of California
Plaintiff: David Ray Williams
Defendant: People of the State of California and Sacramento County
Case Number: 2:2015cv00741
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/2015 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's amended complaint be dismissed; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David Ray Williams signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/18/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/8/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. 2 and 4 ) are dismissed without prejudice; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/03/2015. New Case Number 2:15-cv-741 KJM-CKD. Old Case Number 1:15-cv-403 LJO-SKO.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?