Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. KB Home North Bay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: KB Home North Bay, Inc. and KB Home Sacramento, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00755
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/24/17 ORDERING pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice is GRANTED. Accordingly, this entire action is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/7/17 GRANTING Second Joint Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. The Court AMENDS the deadlines as follows: Initial Expert Disclosures CONTINUED to 4/10/2017. Expert Rebuttal Discl osures CONTINUED to 5/8/2017. Fact Discovery Cut-off CONTINUED to 6/26/2017. Dispositive Motion filing CONTINUED to 8/7/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 10/10/2017 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 12/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/20/16 GRANTING Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. Initial Expert Disclosures due by 2/6/2017. Expert Rebuttal Disclosures 3/6/2017. Fact Discovery Cut-off due by 4/24/2017. Dispositive Motions filing by 6/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 8/14/2017 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial SET for 10/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/12/2015 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference scheduled for 8/17/2015 is hereby VACATED. Parties shall serve initial disclosures no later than 9/15/20 15. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/8/2016, and rebuttal expert disclosure due by 9/6/2016. All discovery shall be completed by 10/28/2016. All motions to compel discovery must be noticed on the magistrate judge's calendar, to be heard not later than 10/28/2016. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 12/2/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is SET for 4/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/12/2015 DENYING 13 KB Home's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Equitable Reimbursement Claim. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/2015 ORDERING that KB shall respond to Travelers' complaint on or before 7/1/2015. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. KB Home North Bay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Home North Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Home Sacramento, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?