February 10, 2021 |
Filing
148
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/9/2021 ADJUSTING defendant's bill of costs to reflect a new total of $29,603.46. DIRECTING plaintiffs to pay this amount to the Yuba County defendants within fourteen days of this order.(Becknal, R)
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing
127
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/19 ORDERING that the County defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in full and defendants McGrath, Vacek, Barr, Stober, Bendorf and the County of Yuba are DISMISS ED. Evans' Motion is GRANTED as to all claims except the state law claim for malicious prosecution. Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
105
SEALING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/24/2018 ORDERING that the Court GRANTS Defendant's 101 request to SEAL records, and the documents contained in Exhibit F to Defendant Timothy J. Evans' Table of Evidence in Support of 100 Motion for Summary Judgment are SEALED. (Becknal, R)
|
June 12, 2018 |
Filing
97
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/11/2018 GRANTING 96 Request for Extension of Pages. Defendants be allowed to up to 30 pages for their Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Any opposition to said motion may also be up to 30 pages in length; and Any reply shall not exceed 15 pages.(Washington, S)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/8/2018 EXTENDING the deadline to file Dispositive Motions until 4/20/2018 and VACATING all remaining dates. The court REFERS this matter to the courts ADR Coordinator. CC'd VDRP Coordinator. (Hunt, G)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
75
STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/11/2017. (Washington, S)
|
May 19, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/18/17: Motion to Quash is denied, and the alternative request for a protective order is granted in part 68 . By no later than May 24, 2017, the parties shall submit a proposed stipulation for a protective order. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/12/17 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Discovery due 8/31/2017, Designation of Expert Witnesses due 10/31/2017, and Supplemental/Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due 11/10/2017.(Kastilahn, A)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
66
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/29/2017. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. All dispositive motions shall be heard no later than 1/12/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/18/16; GRANTING 41 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING-IN-PART 42 Motion to Dismiss. The first, second, third, fourth, tenth, and eleventh claims are dismissed. The fifth claim, for malicious pro secution, is dismissed except as asserted by Santana on an equal-protection basis. GRANTING 43 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING-IN-PART 44 Motion to Dismiss. The first, second, third, and fourth claims are dismissed. The fifth claim, for malicious prosecution, is dismissed except as asserted by Santana on an equal-protection basis. Any amended complaint is due within twenty-one (21) days. A Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Washington, S)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/05/2016 ORDERING the amended complaint shall be filed no later than 4/22/16. (Jackson, T)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/31/2016 ORDERING the complaint DISMISS with leave to amend (see order for details). The Special Motions to Strike are GRANTED IN PART to the extent they are based on the legal deficiencies descr ibed in this order. To the extent the special motions to strike are based on factual deficiencies, however, the motions are DENIED IN PART without Prejudice. Yuba County defendants' motion for a more definite statement is DENIED. This order RESOLVES ECFs 8 , 11 , 15 , 16 , 19 , and 20 . (Donati, J)
|
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/18/2015 ORDERING 15 Yuba County defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the court's standing order. Defendants may file a revised memorandum no later than 7/10/2015. (Reader, L)
|