Terry et al v. Wasatch Advantage Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denika Terry and Roy Huskey, III
Defendant: Wasatch Advantage Group, LLC, Wasatch Property Management, Inc., Wasatch Pool Holdings, LLC, Chesapeake Commons Holdings, LLC, Logan Park Apartments, LLC and Logan Park Apartments, LP
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America and State of California
Case Number: 2:2015cv00799
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/14/20 GRANTING 107 Motion for Clarification. (Kaminski, H)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/10/2019 MODIFYING the 103 Scheduling Order as follows: Fact discovery shall be completed by 38 weeks following the entry of the Court's order regarding 107 Motion for Clarification; Expert witness disclosures due by 4 weeks following the close of fact discovery; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures due by 7 weeks following the close of fact discovery; All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 12 weeks following the close of fact discovery; and All dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 16 weeks following the close of fact discovery. (Huang, H)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/21/19 APPOINTING the law firm of Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho as Class Counsel for the Classes previously certified by this Court on 7/30/18. (Coll, A)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/05/18 GRANTING the parties' 94 Stipulation to amend the third amended complaint to substitute Tamara Livingston as the new class representative for the Rule 23(b)(2) class. Plaintiffs shall have 15 days to file the fourth amended complaint; defendants shall have 15 days to file a responsive pleading upon Plaintiff's filing the fourth amended complaint. (Benson, A.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/30/2018 ORDERING Plaintiffs' 71 motion to amend is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 72 motion for class certification as to the Rule 23(b)(3) class is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for cl ass certification as to the Rule 23(b)(2) class is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, conditioned on plaintiffs substituting a new class representative who has standing for injunctive or declaratory relief under Rule 23(b)(2) within thirty (30) days. (Reader, L)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/11/17 ORDERING that Defendants' 7/14/17 MOTION for leave to take additional depositions 59 is DENIED without prejudice to renewal; and Defendants' 7/21/17 MOTION for leave to take additional depositions 63 is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/24/17 ORDERING that the 7/28/17 hearing of Defendants' MOTION for DISCOVERY 63 is CONTINUED to Friday 8/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The parties shall file a Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement on or before 8/4/17.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/21/2017 GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 26 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the plaintiffs fourteen (14) days to file an amended complaint. (Michel, G.)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE 39 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/13/2017 ORDERING that Discovery re Class Certification be completed by 8/14/2017; CONTINUING the Hearing on Class Certification to 9/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; CONTINUING the Status Conference to 11/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Michel, G.)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/4/2017. (Washington, S)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/24/17 ORDERING that plaintiffs' 47 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART: Motion to Compel Depositions is DENIED; Motion to Compel Further Responses and Production is GRANTED; by 04/14/17, defendants shall produce further responses and documents covering the past 6 years for all of defendants' facilities; defendants' production shall be made pursuant to a stipulated protective order. (Benson, A)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/28/16. The court APPROVES the proposed redactions and orders they be deemed filed as the public version of ECF Nos. 5 and 9, and preserves the seal on the original unredacted documents, ECF Nos. 5 & 9.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/06/2016 DISCHARGING the order to show cause, ECF No. 15, and the United States' request to preserve the seal on the documents dated 6/10/2015 and 12/18/2015, ECF Nos. 5 and 9, is GRANTED. This order is subject to the condition that the United States shall file, within 7 days, proposed redacted versions of those sealed documents, subject to the court's approval. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry et al v. Wasatch Advantage Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denika Terry
Represented By: Christopher David Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Huskey, III
Represented By: Christopher David Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Vincente Antonio Tennerelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasatch Advantage Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasatch Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasatch Pool Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Commons Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Park Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Park Apartments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?