Snipes v. Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terry T Snipes
Defendant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00878
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/5/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's 121 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Kastilahn, A)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/18/2020. GRANTING Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Release. (Kastilahn, A)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2020 TOLLING, in the manner set forth in 114 Stipulation, the 90 day deadline for the Arbitration Associates to initiate individual demands for arbitration against Defendant, as set forth in 101 Memorandum & Order. (Huang, H)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/6/19 GRANTING 92 Motion to Compel. (Kaminski, H)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/23/2019 ORDERING all dispositive motions to be filed by 4/15/2020. Non-expert post-certification discovery shall be completed by 4/30/2020. Disclosure of expert witnesses shall be complet ed by 5/31/2020. Disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses shall be completed by 7/10/2020. Expert discovery shall be completed by 8/31/2020. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last filed dispositive motion. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/19/2018 GRANTING 80 Plaintiffs request for a Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order; the Parties shall meet and confer in that regard and submit a proposed Supplemental Scheduling Order for the Court's consideration not later than 1/8/2019. (Reader, L)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/16/18, GRANTING plaintiff's 73 Motion to Approve Class Notice and Notice Plan. (Kastilahn, A)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/3/18 ORDERING that the Request for approval of withdrawal of counsel made by Steven W. Moore, Esq. and Steven B. Katz, Esq. of Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP, 67 is GRANTED. Attorney Steven B. Katz and Steven Woodrow Moore TERMINATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/27/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff Terry T. Snipes Sr. is HEREBY APPOINTED as class representative; Sutton Hague Law Corporation is HEREBY APPOINTED as class counsel. (Hunt, G)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/09/17 DENYING the 44 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/25/2016 ORDERING that the current deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: Phase I Discovery Cutoff: 11/15/2016; Deadline to file motion for certification: 12/16/2016; Deadline to file opposition: 1/13/2017; Deadline to file reply: 1/27/2017. The hearing on Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED from 10/6/2016 to 2/9/2017 at 2:00 p.m. (Zignago, K.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/16/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DEEMED FILED and served upon entry of this Order; defendant shall file and serve its Answer to the Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. (Benson, A)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/21/16 ORDERING that the parties' stipulated protective order is APPROVED and ENTERED, except that: 1. The designation of documents (including transcripts of testimon y) as confidential pursuant to this order does not automatically entitle the parties to file such a document with the court under seal. The parties must comply with Local Rule 141 with respect to requests to seal documents, and any contrary provis ion is disapproved. 2. With respect to motions regarding any disputes concerning this protective order which the parties cannot informally resolve, the parties shall follow the procedures outlined in Local Rule 251. Absent a showing of good cause, the court will not hear discovery disputes on an ex parte basis or on shortened time. (Benson, A)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/26/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 8 Application for Ex Parte Relief is DENIED. Counsel for Plaintiff is cautioned to more closely heed filings in this matter in the future so as to avoid minimizing waste of the Court's, as well as the parties', time and resources. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snipes v. Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry T Snipes
Represented By: S Brett Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt R Bockes
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mann
Represented By: Lindbergh Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?