Olvera Sr. v. City of Manteca et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Olvera Sr. |
Defendant: |
City of Manteca and Ben Cromwell |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00897 |
Filed: |
April 27, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/18/2018 REFERRING this matter to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for purposes of conducting a settlement conference on 6/28/2018, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 26 (AC), before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (York, M)
|
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
36
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/19/2018 GRANTING the parties' 35 Stipulation; Expert witness discovery is STAYED and all pending deadlines in the instant matter are VACATED. The Court hereby REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for a settlement conference. (Fabillaran, J)
|
May 3, 2017 |
Filing
34
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/2/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/30/2018. Discovery due by 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 7/26/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
30
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2017 ORDERING that a STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS in this matter is GRANTED. (Jackson, T)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/04/2016 ORDERING: Discovery Cut-Off RESET for 7/14/2016; Expert Disclosure RESET for 8/8/2016; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due 8/22/16; and Expert Discovery due 9/23/16. (Jackson, T)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
10
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/22/16 ORDERING that all discovery shall be completed by 5/6/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/7/2016. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, te mporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 11/17/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/23/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 2/16/2017, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. The Jury Trial is SET for 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?