Upper South East Communities Coalition v. US Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: |
Upper South East Communities Coalition |
Defendant: |
US Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas P Bostick, Michael J. Farrell and Michael S. Jewell |
Intervenor: |
Regional Transportation Commission of Washoe County |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00930 |
Filed: |
April 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. ยง 702 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/19/15 ORDERING that, pursuant to 64 Stipulation and FRCP 41(a)(1), this case is DISMISSED. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/2015 GRANTING 43 Ex Parte Application to file Combined Reply Brief. (Donati, J)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER 15 for Shortening Time of Hearing signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/15/2015. Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing is RE-SET for 6/3/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM). Defendants' and defendant intervenor's Responses or Oppositions and supporting papers shall befiled and served no later than 5/20/2015. Plaintiff's Reply and supporting papers shall be filed and served no later than 5/25/2015. (Marciel, M)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/13/2015 ORDERING the Regional Transportation Commission of Washoe County is allowed to intervene. (Zignago, K.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Upper South East Communities Coalition v. US Army Corps of Engineers et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: US Army Corps of Engineers |
Represented By: |
Peter Kryn Dykema, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Martin Francis McDermott, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Davene Dashawn Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas P Bostick |
Represented By: |
Peter Kryn Dykema, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Martin Francis McDermott, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Davene Dashawn Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael J. Farrell |
Represented By: |
Peter Kryn Dykema, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Martin Francis McDermott, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Davene Dashawn Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael S. Jewell |
Represented By: |
Peter Kryn Dykema, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Martin Francis McDermott, GOVT |
Represented By: |
Davene Dashawn Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Upper South East Communities Coalition |
Represented By: |
Winter King |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Intervenor: Regional Transportation Commission of Washoe County |
Represented By: |
Dane W. Anderson |
Represented By: |
Eric E Boyd, PHV |
Represented By: |
Edward A. Cohen, PHV |
Represented By: |
W. Chris Wicker, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?