May 16, 2018 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/15/18 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against all defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
162
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/22/18 GRANTING Plaintiff's AMENDED Motion for order approving Settlement of minor A.E.'s Claims.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing
157
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/17/2018 GRANTING 154 Plaintiff's motion to remove incorrectly filed documents; the Clerk of Court is directed to re-file documents 148 - 150 under SEAL. (Reader, L)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
147
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/08/17 ORDERING that the following dates are reset: Expert Disclosures deadline: 02/01/18; Expert Rebuttal Reports due: 03/05/18; Close of Expert Discovery: 04/16/18; Last day to file dispositive motions is 05/07/18; Last day to file replies to oppositions is 06/25/18; Last day to hear dispositive motions is 07/02/18. (Benson, A.)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
145
ORDER GRANTING 138 Motion for Order Confirming Settlement signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/17. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 22, 2017 |
Filing
140
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2017 APPOINTING Melissa Guidera as guardian ad litem for T.G., Danyelle Ellis as guardian ad litem for A.E., and Ayrella Osby as guardian ad litem for B.E. (Michel, G.)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
133
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/06/17 ORDERING that defendants' 125 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is GRANTED as follows: all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 09/08/17; all counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to tender at trial by 11/30/17. All other dates in the PTSO remain unchanged. (Benson, A)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
129
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/31/17, ORDERING that Defendants produce the following within 15 days of this Order: 1. The documents produced in response to the requests for production in the OAH proceeding; 2. The r edacted investigation report produced to Sherry McDaniel's attorney in the OAH proceeding; 3. The transcripts of interviews and audios of the interviews obtained during the investigation. Said documents and data will be subject to the protective order in place in this matter. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
123
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/24/17 ORDERING that the 110 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED IN PART as follows: All discovery shall be completed by 08/31/17; Expert Disclosures due 10/31/7 and the las t day to hear dispositive motions is 02/28/18. The parties are also ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion. If the parties do not inte nd to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. After review of the parties Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth a final pretrial conference and trial date. (Benson, A)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
106
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/13/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' MOTION for leave 80 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Proposed First Amended Complaint for Damages not later than thirty (30) calendar days from the date this order is electronically filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 6, 2017 |
Filing
105
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/5/17: Fact discovery cutoff is continued to June 30, 2017. Expert disclosure deadline is continued to September 30, 2017. The last day to file dispositive motions is continued to December 29, 2017. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued to The Settlement Conference date remains unchanged. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/2016 ORDERING that the parties' request to enforce the 2/16/2016 subpoena served on Heather Hurrt, MFT, 2330 Professional Drive, Suite 100G, Roseville, CA 95678 is GRANTED. Defendant McDaniel is hereby authorized to obtain, by subpoena, the treatment records of minor plaintiff N.P. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR THE IDENTIFICATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/29/16. (Benson, A)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
77
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/29/2016 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Reader, L)
|
March 21, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/21/16 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to Compel 56 is GRANTED; The City of Rocklin shall produce responsive documents to defendants within fourteen days of the date of this order; and The responsive documents shall be produced subject to a stipulated protective order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/22/16 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' 56 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 3/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; by 03/02/16, the p arties shall file a joint statement re discovery disagreement that complies with the undersigned's standing order and the Local Rules of this court; and by 03/02/16 the parties shall show cause, in writing, as to why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Local Rules and the order of this court. (Benson, A)
|
February 4, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/2/16 ORDERING the Court grants the motion to approve the settlement on behalf of the minors as set forth in the motion; the 10/8/15 Joint Rule 68 Offer of Judgment is approved and the Cl erk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs X.C., Nicole Hill and Keith Caldwell; the special needs trust for X.J.C. as presented to this Court is hereby approved, and Nicole Elysecia Hill and Keith J. Caldwell as Guardians ad Lite m are directed to execute said special needs trust for the minor's benefit. The sum of $1,013,916.85 shall be deposited therein. The Trustee of the special needs trust shall be WestAmerica Bank; Venue for on-going oversight of the specia l needs trust established by the order herein shall lie with the Placer County Superior Court, and the Trustee for the special needs trust shall file an account and report with that Court in the manner and frequency called for by the California Proba te Code; Attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,500 shall be paid from the special needs trust to the Dale Law Firm for preparation of the special needs trust for the minor plaintiff; Defendants shall prepare a draft in the amount of $1,013,916.85 payable to WestAmerica Bank as trustee of the special needs trust; Defendants shall prepare a draft in the amount of $346,083.15 to the Hinton, Alfert and Kahn Trust Account. (Becknal, R)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/22/2015 APPROVING the Joint Rule 68 Offer of Judgment; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs P.R., Richard Rogers and Terrill Rogers pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 68; APPROVING the distribution of proceeds from the Offer of Judgment and the special needs trust submitted with the moving papers; ORDERING that the venue for the on-going oversight of said special needs trust lie with the Placer County Superior Co urt and that the trustees of the special needs trust file an account and report with the Court in the manner and frequency called for by the California Probate Code; ORDERING that the sum of $502,419.93 (five hundred two thousand, four hundred n ineteen dollars and ninety-three cents) be paid directly to the special needs trust of P.R. and held in a blocked account which may only be made available to the trustees upon further order of the Placer County Superior Court; ORDERING that $50, 000.00 of those funds be held in an account that is accessible to the trustees of the trust; ORDERING the trustees of the special needs trust for P.R. to post bond in the amount of $50,000.00; ORDERING that $3,500.00 (three thousand five hundred dollars and zero cents) be paid from the special needs trust to the Dale Law Firm for the preparation of the special needs trust for P.R. (Michel, G.)
|
September 9, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER CONFIRMING THE SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/8/15. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/11/15. ORDERING that the 15 Motion to Appoint Todd Vrooman as Guardian ad Litem for plaintiff S.V. is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/10/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 20 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Plaintiff Michelle Mancour is APPOINTED as Guardian Ad Litem for plaintiff G.I.. (Marciel, M)
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/6/15 ORDERING based on the foregoing, the motion to appoint Jennifer Hugunin as guardian ad litem for D.H., Keith Caldwell and Nicole Hill as guardians ad litem for X.C., and Trishia Pitts as guardian ad litem for N.P. (ECF No. 18 ) is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
|