Chastang v. Cervantes et al
Plaintiff: Loticol Chastang
Defendant: E Cervantes, Ellis and Jeff Macomber
Case Number: 2:2015cv00961
Filed: May 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/08/18 GRANTING 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/22/17 granting 38 Motion to lodge compact disk. Defendants may lodge the compact disk with the Clerk of the Court. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/23/17 granting 34 Motion to modify the scheduling order. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 7/07/17. In all other respects, the 12/08/16 scheduling order 21 remains in full force and effect. (Plummer, M)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/16/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 29 request for the appointment of counsel and plaintiff's 30 request for forms. (Yin, K)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/2/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 25 motions to amend the complaint and for an injunction. (Yin, K)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/30/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Loticol Chastang and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/16 DENYING 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chastang v. Cervantes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loticol Chastang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?