Shannon v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Salvador Shannon
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2015cv00967
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/27/2019 DENYING 106 Motion to certify defendants' qualified immunity appeal as frivolous. (Reader, L)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2018 GRANTING 88 Motion to Strike as to one late-filed document, but DENIES as MOOT the remainder of the motion to strike.; GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 84 Motion for Summary Ju dgment on plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 excessive force claim is DENIED; summary judgment on plaintiff's wrongful death claim is GRANTED only as to the COUNTY, but DENIED as to officers Jones and Reeve. A jury trial will be held on the remaining claim against Jones and Reeve. A Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 9/27/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with a joint pretrial statement due 21 days prior. (Washington, S)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/17/17 ORDERING:(1) Shannon's motion to modify the schedule is DENIED, without prejudice, forfailure to meet and confer. Any future motion to modify the schedule shouldinclude a certificati on that includes a brief summary of meet and confer efforts, as this court's standing order requires. See Standing Order at 3, ECF No. 3-1; (2) Shannon is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within seven (7) days of this order, why monetary sanctions in the amount of $250 should not be issued against him for his failure to comply with this court's Standing Order. (Becknal, R)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/4/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for fact discovery, previously set for 5/15/2017, is VACATED and RESET for 5/19/2017, with all other dates in the scheduling order entered on 11/3/2016 remaining unchanged. (Zignago, K.)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/23/2017. (Michel, G.)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/2/16 ORDERING The deadline for fact discovery is RESET to 5/15/17; The deadline for expert disclosures is RESET to 7/3/17; The deadline for supplemental disclosures of exp ert witnesses is RESET to 8/17/17; The deadline for expert discovery is RESET to 10/3/17; The last day to hear dispositive motions is RESET to 11/17/17; The deadline for the parties' joint pretrial statement is RESET to 3/2/18; The final pretrial conference is RESET to 3/23/18; The deadline for trial briefs is RESET to 4/23/18; and The jury trial date is RESET to 5/7/18. (Becknal, R)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/27/16: Plaintiff shall have 14 days in which to file his proposed Fifth Amended Complaint. The Fifth Amended Complaint shall be deemed served upon the electronic filing of the Fifth Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have 21 days after service of the Fifth Amended Complaint in which to respond in any manner authorized by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kaminski, H)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/22/2016 ORDERING that defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is GRANTED one more opportunity to file an amended pleading. An amended complaint shall be filed within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2015 ORDERING that, within seven days of entry of this order, defendants' counsel shall SHOW CAUSE why they should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for failure to comply with this court's order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Shannon
Represented By: Brenda Coleman
Represented By: Philip James Layfield
Represented By: Estevan R. Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?