Mitchell v. Tseng, et al.
Plaintiff: Randy Dale Mitchell
Defendant: S. Tseng and Karen Todd
Case Number: 2:2015cv01029
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/6/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 17 , 18 motions to waive the remainder of the filing fee. (Yin, K)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Randy Dale Mitchell signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/28/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/3/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete copy of his certified prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.(Dillon, M)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp, or the required $400.00 fees; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Tseng, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Dale Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?