Windham v. California Medical Facility, et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Windham, Jr.
Defendant: California Medical Facility, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Brian Duffy, Manuel Sabin and Zitong Yun
Case Number: 2:2015cv01058
Filed: May 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/21/17 GRANTING 81 Motion to Proceed IFP on appeal. (cc: USCA, 9th circuit) (Plummer, M)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/14/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's request that the court hold a settlement conference 61 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for s ummary judgment 39 be granted with respect to plaintiff's remaining Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Yun and Sabin. Plaintiff's remaining negligence claims be dismissed without prejudice to filing in state court. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be denied. This case be closed. Motion for Summary Judgment 39 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 65 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/06/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Benson, A)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/25/17 recommending that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief 51 be denied. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 51 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/2016 ORDERING within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the 39 motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Yin, K)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/02/16 denying 30 plaintiff's 05/26/16 "Motion Request, resubmitted summary judgment" without prejudice to plaintiff filing a motion for summary judgment that complies with Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Plummer, M)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/26/16 DENYING 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/20/16 ORDERING that, upon 27 reconsideration, the 25 03/11/16 order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Benson, A)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/11/16 denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to plaintiff filing a motion for summary judgment that complies with the requirements of Rule 56. (Plummer, M)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/29/2016 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 are ADOPTED in FULL; Defendant Brian Duffy is DISMISSED from this action. (Reader, L)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/27/2016 ORDERING defendants Sabin and Yun shall file a responsive pleading concerning plaintiff's remaining Eighth Amendment and negligence claims appear ing in plaintiff's 15 amended complaint within 14 days, or file a document indicating their intent to stand on the answer filed 10/5/2015 within fourteen days. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendant Duffy be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/26/2015 DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windham v. California Medical Facility, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duffy
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Sabin
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zitong Yun
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Windham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?