May 24, 2023 |
Filing
146
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/23/2023 GRANTING 144 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Steven Moore, PHV for Food Market Merchandising, Inc., Magic Straws, LLC, Reach Companies, LLC, Jon Tollefson. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is DIRECTED to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
|
January 27, 2023 |
Filing
140
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/27/23 GRANTING 136 defendant's Motion to Compel discovery responses and request for attorneys' fees. Within 30 days of this order, plaintiffs shall serve responses to defendant's requests for production of documents without objection. Within 30 days of this order, attorneys' fees in the amount of $4,075 shall be paid to defendant's counsel. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 2, 2022 |
Filing
131
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/1/2022 GRANTING 126 The California Milk Processor Board's Motion. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 6, 2020 |
Filing
113
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/5/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 96 , 98 Counterdefendants Motions to Dismiss. Counterdefendants shall file a responsive pleading within 30 days of the date of electronic filing of this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
97
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/29/18 ORDERING that that FMMI, shall have an extension of time, until 14 days after the Court has rendered its decision on FMMI's forthcoming motion to dismiss Counts I-IX, XIII, and XIV, unless otherwise ordered, in which to answer Counts X, XI, and XII of CMPB's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim. (Benson, A.)
|
June 26, 2018 |
Filing
93
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/25/2018 APPROVING 92 Stipulation and GRANTING the parties' request. Magic Straws, LLC shall have up to and including 7/25/2018, in which to respond or otherwise plead to Counterclaimant's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim. (York, M)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2018 DENYING 75 , 76 Request for a more Definite Statement. Every claim is DISMISSED with leave to amend as to any Counterdefendant who is alleged to be an alter ego within that claim. COUNT I I against Magic Straws is DISMISSED with leave to amend. COUNTS I-VIII against Reach and Tollefson are DISMISSED with leave to amend. COUNTS IIX, XIII, & XIV against FMMI are DISMISSED with leave to amend. COUNTS XXII against FMMI are NOT DISMISSED. (Washington, S)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/16 ORDERING that attorney Brian C. Leighton is representing Diversified Consumer Goods, LLC, Diversified Flavor, LLC and Paul Henson, an individual, Counter-Defendants, in the above entitled m atter, and it is further ordered that the Clerk's Office notify all of the remaining parties of said appearance and representation by Brian C. Leighton, of Counter-Defendants Diversified Consumer Goods, LLC, Diversified Flavor, LLC and Paul Henson, an individual.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/8/2016 GRANTING Counter-Defendant Diversified Consumer Goods, LLC., Diversified Flavor, LLC. and Paul Henson's Motions 62 , and 67 to Withdraw as Attorney; Counter Defendants have 45 days from the entry of this order to acquire new representation.(Reader, L)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
60
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/5/15: The parties shall conclude their private mediation by January 31, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2015 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Food Market Merchandising, Inc., Counterdefendants Magic Straws, LLC, Reach Companies, LLC, and Jon Tollefson to fi le their Answers to Defendant/Counterclaimant California Mile Processor Board's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims ("SAC") will be thirty (30) days after the last new counterdefendant (Paul Henson, Diversified Flavor, LLC, and Diversified Consumer Goods, LLC) added by the SAC has been served with the summons and the SAC, but in any event no later than 11/6/2015. The deadlines for the new counterdefendants (Paul Henson, Diversified Flavor, LLC, and Diversified Consumer Goods, LLC) to respond to the SAC will not be affected by this Order. (Zignago, K.)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/11/2015 ORDERING 45 that the motions hearing on Counterdefendant Magic Straws, LLC to Dismiss CA Milk Processor Board's Counterclaims; and 41 Counterdefendants Food Market Merchandising, Inc., Reach Companies, LLC, and Jon Tollefson to Dismiss CA Milk Processor Board's Counterclaims, presently set for 10/8/2015, are CONTINUED to 10/22/2015, at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Reader, L)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/24/15. The hearing as to the 38 and 41 Motions to Dismiss is reset for 10/8/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Manzer, C)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
36
STIPULATION and ORDER 35 for extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2015. Counterdefendant Magic Straws, Inc. shall have up to and including 7/29/2015 in which to respond or otherwise plead to counter-claimants 27 First Amended Counterclaim. (Marciel, M)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/17/2015 GRANTING 33 the parties' request to respond to the first amended counter-claim; and that counter-defendants FMMI, Jon Tollefson and Reach Companies, Inc. shall have an extension of time up to and including 7/16/2015, in which to respond or otherwise plead to Counter-claimant's first amended complaint. (Reader, L)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
28
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/4/15 ORDERING that the court DECLINES to relate the cases. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/2015 GRANTING CMPB's extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint. The California Milk Processor Board has until 6/2/2015 to file a response to the FMMI's Amended Complaint. (Donati, J)
|