Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ahmadi
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Mohammad Wasim Ahmadi
Case Number: 2:2015cv01106
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/17: The findings and recommendations 19 are adopted in full. Plaintiff's Motion for default judgment 14 is granted. Judgment is entered against defendant in the sum of $6,000.00. This case is closed. (Kaminski, H)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/18/2016 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 14 motion for default judgment be granted. Judgment be entered against defendant in the sum of $6,000. This case be closed. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/20/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's 7 Ex Parte Application is GRANTED; plaintiff has an additional 30 days to effectuate service of the Summons and Complaint or file a motion for service by publicaton, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Mohannad Wasim Ahmadi. (Benson, A)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff is granted an additional 60 days from today's date to effectuate service of the Summons and Complaint filed in this matter, or to file a motion for service by publication, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Mohammad Wasim Ahmadi, where service has not been made or service by publication requested. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ahmadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Wasim Ahmadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?