Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC and Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company Doing business as Shasta Regional Medical Center
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 2:2015cv01120
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/2018 ORDERING the following actions are consolidated for all purposes, including trial and all pretrial matters: 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00154-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00324-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00400-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00450-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00473-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00474-TLN-KJN;. 2:15-cv-00709-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-01120-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-00230-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN; and 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN; Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date this Order is entered to file the Proposed consolidated Complaint. That filing shall be docketed solely on the docket for Case No. 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN. Going forward no filing should be made under any of the other case numbers listed in the preceding paragraph; Defendant shall have forty-five (45) days after service of the Proposed Consolidated Complaint to file an answer. (Becknal, R))
December 27, 2017 Filing 48 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Gregory T. Broderick for Sylvia Mathews Burwell, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv terminated (Broderick, Gregory)
December 19, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE Related Actions and Extend Time for Filing Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. Attorney Farag, Shareef added. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farag, Shareef) Modified on 12/29/2017 (Zignago, K.).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/17 ORDERING that the Motion to Consolidate Cases #45 is DENIED without prejudice. However, as the parties agree that attorneys for Plaintiff need time to familiarize themselves with this case, Plaintiff may file a Motion to Consolidate attaching its proposed amended complaint as an exhibit within sixty (60) days of the date this Order is filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES and MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. Attorney Pearson, Matthew D. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Pearson, Matthew)
August 14, 2017 Filing 44 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
August 14, 2017 Filing 43 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/2017 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #36 in each of these actions are VACATED; Defendant's #15 Motion to Dismiss filed in each of these actions is GRANTED; these actions are DISMISSED, but Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days leave to amend.(Reader, L)
June 6, 2017 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #38 Objections to Findings and Recommendations by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Montoya, Bobbie)
May 23, 2017 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Samuel J. Romero re #38 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 39 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC in re #38 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #36 by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 37 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #36 by Defendant Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Montoya, Bobbie)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 [VACATED SEE ORDER [ #42 ]FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/17 RECOMMENDING that Defendant's motion to dismiss filed in each of these actions be GRANTED. These actions be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close these cases. Matter referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 7/17/2017 (Reader, L).
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/2016 REFERRING #15 all pending Motion to Dismiss in the LEAD action and the RELATED CASES to Magistrate Judge Newman for Findings and Recommendations; ADDITIONALLY the Court ORDERS that all future motions to dismiss or motions to amend be noticed before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Reader, L)
December 15, 2016 Filing 34 RESPONSE to 33 Minute Order by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
December 1, 2016 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on December 1, 2016: Upon review of the parties' Joint Statement filed on November 9, 2016 (ECF No. #31 ), the Court asks Plaintiff to indicate whether it consents to sending the pending motions to dismiss, in the instant case and all related cases, before the Magistrate Judge for Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff shall notify the Court of its decision within fourteen (14) days of this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 18, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02791, 2:15-cv-00154, 2:15-cv-00324, 2:15-cv-00400, 2:15-cv-00450, 2:15-cv-00473, 2:15-cv-00474, 2:15-cv-00709, 2:16-cv-00230, 2:16-cv-02521, 2:16-cv-02278 by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
November 9, 2016 Filing 31 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Court's Proposal to Appoint Special Master by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. Attorney Romero, Samuel Joel added. (Romero, Samuel) Modified on 11/10/2016 (Zignago, K.).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/2/16 ORDERING the parties to meet and confer within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order and file a joint statement apprising the Court of whether they will consent to the appointment of a special master.(Washington, S)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/28/2016 GRANTING #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Andrew H. Selesnick, Damaris L. Medina, and Ketakee R. Kane are WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Services Shasta, LLC. (Butolph, J)
October 25, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Ronald S. Hodges ADDED for Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Hodges, Ronald) Modified on 10/26/2016 (Michel, G.).
August 17, 2016 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/17/2016: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (ECF No. #26 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/25/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 19, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY of Andrew H. Selesnick, Damaris L. Medina, and Ketakee R. Kane by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 7/21/2016 (Jackson, T).
April 1, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/1/2016: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #15 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 4/7/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 24, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE AMENDED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Sylvia Mathews Burwell re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Montoya, Bobbie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY by Sylvia Mathews Burwell to RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Montoya, Bobbie)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER #21 for continuance signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/2016. The hearing on defendant's #15 Motion to Dismiss shall be heard on 4/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN). Defendant's Reply Briefs, if any, shall be filed and served no later than 3/24/2016. (Marciel, M)
February 22, 2016 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the hearing on #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 2/23/2016 (Michel, G.).
January 28, 2016 Filing 20 OPPOSITION by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC to #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Kane, Ketakee)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/13/16 ORDERING that the hearing on Defendant's pending MOTION to DISMISS #15 shall be heard on 3/10/2016. Plaintiff's opposition to the pending MOTION to DISMISS, if any, shall be filed and served by no later than 1/28/2016. Defendant's reply briefs, if any, shall be filed and served no later than 2/25/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 12, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/23/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's oppositions to defendant's motion to dismiss due on 1/14/16, defendant's replies in support of motion to dismiss due on 2/11/16. The hearing on #15 defendant's Motion to Dismiss is SET for 2/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
October 22, 2015 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
October 5, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Montoya, Bobbie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL FOR SERVICE: Attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv ADDED for Sylvia Mathews Burwell; Attorney Edward A. Olsen, GOVT TERMINATED. (Montoya, Bobbie) Modified on 10/2/2015 (Michel, G.).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/18/15 re: #12 ORDERING the responsive pleading deadline MOVED to 10/5/15. (Meuleman, A)
August 17, 2015 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Olsen, Edward)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/14/15 ORDERING that The Deadline for filing a Responsive Pleading in each cease is EXTENDED to 9/4/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Ketakee R. Kane. (Kane, Ketakee)
July 2, 2015 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 7/8/2015 (Meuleman, A).
June 10, 2015 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC Waiver sent on 6/2/2015. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 6/10/2015 (Krueger, M).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Krueger, M)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2015 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:15-cv-1120 GEB-CMK is hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:15-cv-1120 TNL-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00154-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00324-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00400-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00450-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00473-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00474-TLN-KJN, 2:15-cv-00709-TLN-KJN by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
May 29, 2015 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
May 26, 2015 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 8/31/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Michel, G.)
May 26, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sylvia Mathews Burwell* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Ketakee R. Kane* *Michelman& Robinson, LLP* *15760 Ventura Boulevard, 5th Floor* *Encino, CA 91436*. (Michel, G.)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0972-5906391) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Medina, Damaris) Modified on 5/26/2015 (Michel, G.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Troy Allyn Schell
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Andrew H. Selesnick
Represented By: Damaris L. Medina
Represented By: Ketakee R. Kane
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company Doing business as Shasta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Troy Allyn Schell
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Andrew H. Selesnick
Represented By: Damaris L. Medina
Represented By: Ketakee R. Kane
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Bobbie Jo Montoya
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Represented By: Edward A. Olsen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?