February 24, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/23/2017 DENYING Plaintiff's 80 Motion for Reconsideration. (Jackson, T)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/05/16 ordering within five days of this order, Jesse Rivera, Jamil Ghannam, or Jonathan Paul shall either: A. Indicate in writing that they intend to continue representation of Ms. Delgado i n this matter and indicate whether they will accept service of process in 2:15-cv-1260 MCE CKD P on behalf of Ms. Delgado. If they will not accept service, Mr. Rivera, Ghannam, or Paul must explain why not and file with the court, under seal, Ms. Delgados address; B. File a motion asking that Jesse Rivera, Jamil Ghannam, and Jonathan Paul be permitted to withdraw as counsel pursuant to Local Rule 182(d); or C. File a motion for substitution of counsel under Local Rule 182(g). (Plummer, M)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
74
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/28/16 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 40 ) be granted; Plaintiff's amended complaint be dismissed for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies prior to filing suit; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/2016 DENYING the 62 motion to compel. (Yin, K)
|
September 29, 2016 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/29/16 ordering The proposed protective order 61 submitted by counsel for defendant Delgado and counsel for defendants Baker and Ramirez is hereby rejected. (Plummer, M)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/01/16 ordering that defendants' requests 56 , 57 are granted in part and denied in part as follows: All court orders regarding the deadlines for serving requests for discovery and provi ding responses thereto remain in effect: A. The deadline for serving discovery requests passed on July 18, 2016; no party is granted an extension of time serve additional requests for discovery. B. Defendant Baker and Ramirezs responses to plaintiffs request for production of documents must be served upon plaintiff no later than September 5, 2016. Any motion to compel regarding those responses shall be filed by plaintiff no later than October 1, 2016. C. All of plaintiffs responses to any disco very request shall be served no later than September 10, 2016. The following deadlines currently in effect are modified as follows: A. The deadline for filing any motion to compel regarding plaintiffs responses to any request for discovery is stayed until further notice from the court. B. The deadline for filing a motion for summary judgment, other than the motion concerning plaintiffs alleged failure to exhaust administrative remedies currently before the court, is stayed until further notice from the court. C. The September 16, 2016 date for the close of discovery is vacated. That date will be reset, if appropriate, after resolution of the pending motion for summary judgment. All other requests made by defendants in their requests for extensions of time (ECF No. 56 & 57 ) are denied. (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/1/2016 (Plummer, M).
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/10/16. (Plummer, M)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
48
AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/5/2016 ORDERING 45 that the action denominated 2:15-cv-01260 EFB, Leon Durell Hobley v. E. Baker, et al. is REASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:15-cv-01260 MCE CKD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Reader, L)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
45
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/29/2016 ORDERING that case numbers 2:15-cv-1155-MCE-CKD and 2:15-cv-1260-EFB are RELATED. Case 2:15-cv-1260-EFB is REASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Ma gistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:15-cv-01260-MCE-EFB. (Zignago, K.)(Zignago, K.)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/1/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 17 motion for reconsideration, with respect to plaintiff's request that he be granted leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 30 days, this action will proceed on the original complaint and pursuant to the terms of the court's 8/26/2015 screening order. (Yin, K)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Donald Williams and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/2/15 DENYING 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Meuleman, A)
|