Alvarez Zardain v. IPACPA US, Inc.

Plaintiff: Enrique Alvarez Zardain
Defendant: IPACPA US, Inc. and TRC Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01207
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/5/2018 DISMISSING case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/9/2017 STAYING all further proceedings in this action until 7/31/2019; CONTINUING all deadlines and requirements until after the expiration of the stay. CASE STAYED. (Michel, G.)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/6/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's 37 Motion Hearing on Relief From Pretrial Scheduling Order Reset for 2/9/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Opposition due by 1/20/2017; and Replies due by 1/27/2017. (Reader, L)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/13/2016 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 37 Motion for Relief from the Pretrial Scheduling Order to 1/12/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING Defendant TRC Holdings Inc. to file an Opposition by 12/8/2016; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Reply by 12/15/2016. (Michel, G.)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/16/16 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION Seeking Relief from Pretrial Scheduling Order 37 is CONTINUED from 12/1/16 to 12/15/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The deadline for submitting any opposition or reply to said Motion shall be calculated under the Court's Local Rules pursuant to the continued hearing date. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Ex Parte Application signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/26/16. (Kaminski, H)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/19/16 ORDERING that the Discovery completion date is EXTENDED to 10/14/16; all other provisions and completion dates set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. (Benson, A)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/21/2016 ADOPTING IN FULL 18 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 14 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice to renewal at the conclusion of the case on the merits. (Michel, G.)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/24/16 recommending that plaintiff's motion for default judgment 14 be denied without prejudice to renewal at the conclusion of the case on the merits. F&R referred to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez Zardain v. IPACPA US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Alvarez Zardain
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPACPA US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?