Clark v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Felicia Clark
Defendant: County of Sacramento, City of Sacramento and Andrew Nelson
Case Number: 2:2015cv01211
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/21/19 RECOMMENDING that 60 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted, that Judgment be entered and that this action be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/2/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The hearing of 60 the Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 10/19/18, plaintiff shall file a reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/18 GRANTING 59 Plaintiff's Request to modify the scheduling order; GRANTING 58 Defendant's Request to modify Scheduling order. Discovery shall be completed by 11/2/2018. All Pretr ial Motions shall be completed by 12/14/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. A Jury Trial is SET for 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/31/18, DENYING without prejudice defendants' 52 Motion to Compel. The 8/3/2018 hearing of defendants' motion is VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/22/2018 GRANTING 50 Motion to Continue. The parties shall disclose experts no later than 7/20/2018; The parties shall disclose any rebuttal experts no later than 7/27/2018; and This order does not alter any other deadlines set in this action. (Washington, S)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/17/17 ORDERING that A Status Conference is SET for 12/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 12/1/2017 and defendant shall file and serve a status report on or before 12/8/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 7/12/17 37 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' 12/5/16 MOTION to DISMISS 30 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; The second amend ed complaint's Monell and violation of the ADA claims are DISMISSED without leave to amend; The second amended complaint's claim for illegal seizure against defendant County of Sacramento is DISMISSED without leave to amend; Defendant Nel son and Defendant Kemp are directed to file an answer within fourteen days of the date of this order to the second amended complaint's claims for retaliation in violation of the First Amendment; false arrest; excessive force; and illegal seizure of property; and Defendant County of Sacramento is DISMISSED from this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/14/2017 ORDERING 38 that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/11/2017 RECOMMENDING: the 30 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part; that the 29 Amended Complaint's Monell and violation of the ADA claims be dismi ssed without leave to amend and claim for illegal seizure against defendant County of Sacramento be dismissed without leave to amend; Defendant Nelson and Defendant Kemp be directed to file an answer within fourteen days of the date of any order adop ting these findings and recommendations to the second amended complaint's claims for retaliation in violation of the First Amendment; false arrest; excessive force; and illegal seizure of property; and Defendant County of Sacramento be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Washington, S)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/29/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days as to why this case shall not be dismissed for lack of prosection; the 01/06/17 hearing on the 30 Motion to Dismiss is RESET for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' 30 Motion to Dismiss by 01/20/17. (Benson, A)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/21/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/26/2016 ORDERING a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/7/2016, and defendants shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/14/2016. (Jackson, T)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/31/16: The findings and recommendations filed July 26, 2016 18 are adopted in full. Motion to dismiss 11 is granted in part and denied in part. The complaint's claims for illegal seizure, Monell, and violation of the ADA are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted twenty-eight days to file an amended complaint that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 8/31/2016 (Kaminski, H).
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/25/16 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' 11 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part; the complaint's claims for illegal seizure, Monell, and vi olation of the ADA be dismissed with leave to amend; Plaintiff be granted 28 days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations to file an amended complaint; and if after the 28 days has passed plaintiff has not filed an ame nded complaint, defendants be directed to file an answer within 14 days to the complaint's claims of retaliation, false arrest and excessive force. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/3/16 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' 11 motion to dismiss is continued to 3/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Plaintiff shall sh ow cause, in writing, no later than 2/17/2016, why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-oppositionto the pending motion. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 2/17/2016. Defendants may file a reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 2/24/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/9/15 ORDERING that Defendants Nelson and Kemp's 9 request for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 1/10/2016. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kastilahn, A)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/28/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to issue process and to send plaintiff an instruction sheet for service of process by the United States Mars hal, 4 USM-285 forms, a Summons form, and an endorsed copy of plaintiff's 1 Complaint filed 6/5/2015. Within 30 days after Order is served, plaintiff shall submit to United States Marshal 4 properly completed USM-285 forms, 4 properly completed Summons, and the number of copies of endorsed complaint and of this order required by the United States Marshal. Clerk directed to serve a copy of Order on U.S. Marshal. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?