Hackert v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: John B. Hackert
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Health Corporation and Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc., Cigna Health Corporation and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: John B. Hackert
Case Number: 2:2015cv01248
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/18 GRANTING Cigna's unopposed motion to dismiss this case in full. This resolves ECF No. 114 . With no claims remaining, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to oppose, within 14 days, the 114 Motion to Dismiss. If Hackert does not file an opposition with the court, the court will grant the motion as unopposed. (York, M)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/9/18 ORDERING that the clerk of court file under seal the Declaration of Emily Russell (ECF No. 23-3, Exhibits B-1 and E-1). Within two days of the filing of this order, defendants are directed to file a redacted copy of the declaration.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/29/18: Mr. Hackert and Mr. Leavitt to (1) file a status report regarding the status of their efforts to finalize the settlement agreement; and (2) SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days why each of them should not pay a $250 sanction for failing to heed this court's instruction. (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/30/17 ORDERING Hackert is entitled to a jury trial on the threshold assignment issue and on two of Cigna's counterclaims to the extent they are tried at all. His demand for a jury tri al on all other claims and issues is DENIED. Given the alternative pleadings, and unless otherwise stipulated, a jury trial shall address the first threshold question: Whether Hackert received benefits assignments. If he did, the fifth and six claims are moot and the bench will preside over all remaining claims. If Hackert did not receive benefits assignments, a jury will hear the fifth and sixth claims, and a bench trial will follow on the seventh claim. (Becknal, R)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AMENDED 78 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/8/17 ORDERING the Trial on Cigna's seven counterclaims is confirmed to begin 11/13/17 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must exchange exhibits no later than twenty-eight days before trial. Any objections to exhibits are due no later than fourteen days before trial. (Becknal, R)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/6/2017 ORDERING that the court sets the following date for adjudicating defendant's counterclaim: The parties shall file a joint pre-trial statement (including witness and exhibit lists) by Friday, 5/31/2017; The final pre-trial conference is set for 6/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3. (Zignago, K.)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/9/16 Recommending that Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&RS due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/02/16 ORDERING that the hearing on the 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 10/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion by 09/21/16; any reply is due by 09/28/16. (Benson, A)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/11/2016 ORDERING that the 14 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's 6 motion for remand is DENIED. Plaintiff's 7 motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/3/15 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's motion for remand 6 be denied; and Plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims 7 be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackert v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health Corporation
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc.
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc.
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cigna Health Corporation
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Represented By: David Patrick McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John B. Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?