Norman v. Riaz et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Norman
Defendant: Riaz and D. Bodenhamer
Case Number: 2:2015cv01346
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/17/17 ordering the Custodian to produce Daniel J. Norman on 3/09/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CMK and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/12/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 26 Motion for Reconsideration and to Vacate Deadlines is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the undersigned has reconsidered the 21 court's 07/11/16 Order, in light of plaintiff's objections to the 19 magistrate judge's 06/10/16 findings and recommendations, and AFFIRMS the 21 07/11/16 order adopting the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations. Plaintiff's request to vacate deadlines is DENIED as moot. (Benson, A)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/11/16 ORDERING that defendant Dr. Riaz shall file and serve an answer to plaintiffs complaint within 21 days after the filing date of this order.(Dillon, M)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/8/16: Defendant Bodenhamer is dismissed form this action. This action shall proceed only against defendant Dr. Ruiz on plaintiff's Eight Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs. (Kaminski, H)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/10/2016 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 15 motion to dismiss be granted in part an d denied in part; Defendant Bodenhamer be dismissed from this action; and this action proceed only against defendant Dr. Riaz on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs. Assigned and referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Daniel J. Norman signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/26/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the #350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Riaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bodenhamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?