Boyd v. Riverpoint 714, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ishoniqa Boyd
Defendant: Riverpoint 714, LLC and CTL Management, Inc.
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv01406
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/24/16 GRANTING defendants an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendants shall file and serve their response to the complaint on or before 9/28/16.(Washington, S)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/24/2016 GRANTING United States' Request to Redact. Documents 11-1 and 17 are SEALED. The United States shall file a redacted copy of ECF 11-1 within 7 days from the date of this order. (Donati, J)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/9/2016 ORDERING that the United States' Request to retain the seal on the remaining court documents is DENIED; within 5 business days of the date this order is filed, any party may SHOW CAUSE in camera why the remaining documents should be redacted before unsealing; the Clerk of the Court shall maintain a temporary seal over the remaining documents pending the parties' response to the show cause order above.(Reader, L)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/2016 ORDERING 1 The complaint, the United States' 13 Notice, this order, and all future filings are UNSEALED, but all other contents of the court's file in this action remain und er TEMPORARY SEAL pending further order of this court; within 14 days, any party may SHOW CAUSE why the previous filings in this action should remain under seal; Relator shall serve the complaint on the defendants; the parties shall hereafter serve a ll pleadings and motions filed in this action, including supporting memoranda, upon the US, as provided for in 31:3730(c)(3), and the US may order any deposition transcripts and is entitled to intervene in this action, for good cause, at any time; th e parties shall serve all notices of appeal upon the US; the Clerk of the Court shall send all orders of this court to the US; and should any relator or defendant propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the court will solicit the written consent of the US before ruling or granting its approval. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Riverpoint 714, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishoniqa Boyd
Represented By: Christopher David Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverpoint 714, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTL Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Vincente Antonio Tennerelli(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?