Martin v. Butte
Plaintiff: Kara Jolie Martin
Defendant: County of Butte
Case Number: 2:2015cv01409
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/21/2017 ORDERING 15 that the Hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment Reset for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Plaintiff's Opposition by 5/4/2017; and Defendants' reply by 5/11/2017. (Reader, L)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/22/17 ORDERING that the hearing on 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 5/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Plaintiff's opposition due on 4/20/17, and defendant's reply due on 4/27/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2016 ORDERING that the discovery deadline is CONTINUED to 1/27/2017 for the limited purpose of obtaining Plaintiff's mental health records. (Zignago, K.)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2015 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 1 Complaint by 12/18/2015. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Jolie Martin
Represented By: Marguerite Melo
Represented By: John Sarsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?