Smith v. Giovannini et al
Plaintiff: Wayne D. Smith
Defendant: John Giovannini, Placer County Sheriff, Christopher Cattran, Deputy District Attorney, Placer County Jail, Ricky Martino and John C. Rogers, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01410
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/3/2018 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 2/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The parties are directed to submit Confidential Settlement Conference Statements 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference and file a Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement. An Informal Telephonic Conference is SET for 2/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Huang, H)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/03/18 SETTING Status Conference for 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/23/18, ORDERING that Defendant's 44 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Plaintiff's 51 motion for a jury trial is DENIED without prejudice. Plai ntiff's 52 motion to show cause is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's 54 motion for discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Within 21 days of the date of this order each party shall file a status report addressing whether this matter should be set for a settlement conference or proceed directly to a final pretrial conference. (Kastilahn, A)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/22/2017 VACATING the final pretrial conference and the trial dates and TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. (York, M)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/9/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The hearing of Defendant's 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 12/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 12/8/2017, plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/29/17 ORDERING that: the parties' 6/23/17 stipulation (ECF No. 42 ) is GRANTED as modified below; Discovery shall be completed by 10/13/17; All pretrial motions, except motions to com pel discovery, shall be completed by 11/17/17; the 12/15/17 final pretrial conference is CONTINUED to Friday, 1/26/18, at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom no. 27 before the undersigned; and the 2/26/18 jury trial is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/26/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 27 before the undersigned. (Becknal, R)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/6/17 ORDERING Plaintiff's 34 motion for transcripts is DENIED; and Plaintiff's 35 motion re objections is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/17/2016 ORDERING Status Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; Plaintiff shall file and serve a stats report on or before 11/18/2016; and defendant by 11/25/2016.(Reader, L)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff may proceed now to serve Officer Giovannini, as set forth below (instructions numbered 3-6), and pursue his claim against only that defendant. Alternatively, he may delay serving Officer Giovannini, and attempt to state additional cognizable claims; If plaintiff elects to attempt to further amend his complaint to state additional cognizable claims he has thirty days to do so (and he may skip instruction s numbered 3-6, below). He is not obligated to amend his complaint, and may instead proceed only against Officer Giovannini (see instructions 3-6, below); If plaintiff elects to proceed now against Officer Giovannini, then within thirty days pla intiff shall supply the U.S. Marshal with the information detailed below. If plaintiff elects to proceed against Officer Giovannini, the court will construe plaintiff's election as consent to the dismissal of all other claims without prejudic e; Service is appropriate for defendant Placer County Sheriff's Officer John Giovannini; the Clerk shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, a copy of the amended complaint filed 2/10/16 (ECF No. 8 ), an instruction sheet, and an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge; Plaintiff is directed to supply the U.S. Marshal, within 30 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the U.S. Marshal to effect service of process, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. (cc USM)(Becknal, R)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/7/2016. Plaintiff's 2 3 Motions to Proceed Informa Pauperis are GRANTED and the 7/2/2015 1 Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Within 28 days from date of Order, an Amended Complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in Order. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Giovannini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Giovannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cattran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Rogers, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?