Baek et al v. Halvorson et al
Plaintiff: Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC and Pacific Commercial Group, LLC
Defendant: John O. Halvorson, Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall, PCC Fund 1, LLC, Granite Bay Partners II, LLC, JH Re Holdings, LLC and Commercial Income Advisors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01425
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/10/18, ORDERING that the Trustee's 39 Motion for Changing Venue, which the answering defendants have joined, is GRANTED. Case TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. All other currently pending motions 17 , 18 are MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/4/2018 DENYING Weneta Kosmala's Requests for Continuance 19 , 34 . (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/1/2018 DENYING 31 Debtor John O. Halvorson attorney's Motion to Appear Telephonically. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/25/2018 re 26 Attorney Mark Forsythe's MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the 6/11/2018 motions hearing: No opposition has yet been filed regarding those motions. The court wishes to reserve decision on counsel's request to appear telephonically until after any opposition to the underlying motions has been filed. Counsel is directed to re-submit his request after the opposition has been filed. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/09/15 ORDERING that all proceedings in this action are STAYED pending the resolution of the Bankruptcy Proceedings, or until the Court lifts the stay; all dates and deadlines currently pending in the action are VACATED. The Court will hold a new Status Conference after resolution of the Bankruptcy Proceedings until the Court lifts the stay. Case stayed (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baek et al v. Halvorson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Baek
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baek 153, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Commercial Group, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Halvorson
Represented By: Marc C Forsythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan L. Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ann Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Fund 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Bay Partners II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH Re Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Income Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?