Coleman v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: |
Saahdi Coleman |
Defendant: |
C. Davis, Fred Foulk and Ron Barnes |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01434 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/2018 GRANTING plaintiff another 30-day extension of time to file the documents necessary to effectuate service of process. Failure to do so may result in a recommendation of dismissal. (Yin, K) Modified on 10/2/2018 (Yin, K).
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/26/18 ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; The First Amendment access to the courts claim against defendants Barnes, Foulk, and Davis is dismissed without leave to amend; and This matter is referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/7/2017 WITHDRAWING 10 Findings and Recommendations; DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit service documents and USM-285 Forms; and RECOMMENDING that the 1st Amendmen t access to the courts claim against defendants Barnes, Foulk, and Davis be dismissed without leave to amend. Service is appropriate for C. Davis on the 1st Amendment retaliation claim. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form with ins truction sheet, and 1 copy of the First Amended Complaint filed on 5/12/2017. Plaintiff to submit completed service documents and Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days from service of this order. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/9/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
January 27, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Saadhi Coleman and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?