Ortiz v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Cherish Fawn Ortiz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv01456
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/22/17. Plaintiff is AWARDED attorneys' fees in the total amount of $7,585.00 pursuant to the EAJA. (Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/16/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 13 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Commissioner's 17 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner. The Clerk shall enter judgment. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/15 ordering the time for responding to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be extended from 12/30/15 to 2/01/16. (Plummer, M)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/12/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to serve Judge Claire's Scheduling Order and to serve copy of Order to U.S. Marshal. Within 14 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall submit to United States Marshal a completed Summons and copies of 1 Complaint and file a Statement with Court that said documents have been submitted. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services](Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherish Fawn Ortiz
Represented By: John Vincent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?