Ahmed v. Duffy et al
Plaintiff: Saiyez Ahmed
Defendant: Brian Duffy, Johnson and R. Lacebal
Case Number: 2:2015cv01470
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/03/18 The Clerk of Court is directed to recaption plaintiffs motion filed December 26,2017, 48 , as a request for verification of indigent status, which is HEREBYGRANTED. The clerk of the court i s further directed to send plaintiff together with a copy of this order, 1 copy of each of the following: Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis in this action, 5 . This courts order approving plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis in thisaction, 6 . Plaintiffs instant request and the attached application, 48 . (Plummer, M)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/19/17 31 ADOPTED in full; Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 15 is DENIED; and Defendant is directed to file and serve an answer to the First Amended Complaint within twenty-one days after the filing date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/16/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 40 "Motion for Court's Consideration in Prosecution for Perjury for Declarant D. Sanchez". (Yin, K)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/14/2017 OVERRULING 37 Plaintiff's objections to 35 Order discharging the order to show cause. Should the district judge adopt the 31 Findings and Recommendations, defendant will be directed to file and serve an answer to the First Amended Complaint, and this case will then be further scheduled. (Henshaw, R)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/24/17 ordering that the order to show cause issued 07/10/17 33 is discharged. (Plummer, M)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/10/2017 ORDERING the Deputy AG representing sole defendant Johnson shall contact the litigation coordinator at CSP-LAC and, within 10 days, file and serve a statement that responds to plaintiff's allegations, identifies any adverse impacts to plaintiff resulting from his participation in the settlement conference in this case, and specifies how and when CSP-LAC officials intend to resolve any continuing adverse impacts.(Yin, K)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/16/17 ORDERING defendant's request for judicial notice 16 is granted. Defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's surreply 22 is denied. Also, RE COMMENDING that defendant's motion to dismiss 15 be denied; and defendant be directed to file and serve an answer to the First Amended Complaint within 21 days after the denial of his motion to dismiss. MOTION to DISMISS 15 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISCHARGING 26 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Saiyez Ahmed, CDCR#P-27595 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/09/17 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Saiyez Ahmed on 6/09/17 at 8:30 a.m. at CSP-CORCORAN. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk is ordered to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Saiyez Ahmed signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/24/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/20/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall, within 30 days from the filing date of this order, submit a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided her ewith by the Clerk of Court; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall, within 30 days from the filing date of this order, submit a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of plaintiff's complaint.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Duffy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saiyez Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lacebal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?