Miramontes v. Gower et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Miramontes
Defendant: Herrera
Case Number: 2:2015cv01544
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/18/2017 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's remaining 1st Amendment claim be dismissed, Plaintiff's claim arising under CA Constitution be dismissed without prejudice, and this case be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/16 granting 29 Motion for an evidentiary hearing. An evidentiary hearing will be held before the undersigned on 1/09/17 at 9:00 a.m. A writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum will issu e for plaintiff's appearance at the hearing. Within 21 days, plaintiff shall serve any proposed exhibits on defendant. If plaintiff has any exhibits, he shall use numbers to identify them. Defendant shall serve his exhibits upon plaintiff withi n 14 days after receiving plaintiffs. Defendant shall use letters to identify his exhibits. On the day of the hearing, the parties shall bring three copies of their exhibits. Motions in limine, if any, will be heard the day of the hearing. If either party wishes to call a witness other than plaintiff or defendant, the party shall inform the court within 21 days of this Order of the name of the witness and the purpose of his/her testimony. If the proposed witness is an inmate, the party must provide his/her California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation inmate number, his/her location and indicate whether the inmate agrees to testify voluntarily. (Plummer, M)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/23/16 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed August 10, 2016, is affirmed. (Becknal, R)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/31/16. (Kaminski, H)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/10/16. (Plummer, M)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/25/16 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court assign a District Judge to this case. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 22 be denied. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 22 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miramontes v. Gower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Miramontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?