Gomes v. Boone et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Marie Gomes
Defendant: Nick Boone, Williams and Placer County Probation Department
Case Number: 2:2015cv01546
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/23/2020 SETTING a Jury Trial for 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimated a trial length of three (3) days. (Kastilahn, A)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/06/2019 DENYING Defendants' motion as to Plaintiff's first cause of action and GRANTING summary judgment as to Plaintiff's second cause of action. (Becknal, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER vacating 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/6/17. Defendants shall re-notice their motion for summary judgment for hearing before the undersigned. At the hearing of defendants' motion for s ummary judgment plaintiff shall be prepared to show cause as to why the undersigned should not sanction plaintiff in the amount of $250 for her repeated failure to comply with this court's orders and Local Rules, and for failing to timely prosecute this action. Plaintiff is cautioned that the failure to appear at the hearing of defendants motion for summary judgment may result in a sanction greater than $250.(Kastilahn, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/15/2017; DENYING as MOOT 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; and VACATING the 6/23/2017 hearing. RECOMMENDING the 1 Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice; and this action be CLOSED. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Washington, S)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/23/17 ORDERING that the 3/31/17 order to show cause is DISCHARGED; The 5/26/17 hearing of Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 35 is CONTINUED to Friday, 6/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtro om 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 6/9/17, Plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment; The 7/13/17 final pretrial conference and 9/11/17 trial date s are hereby VACATED, to be reset after the resolution of Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment; and Plaintiff is again cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/30/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The 4/7/2017 hearing of defendants' 35 motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to Friday, 5/26/2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 27. On or before 5/12/2017, plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff is cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/21/16 ORDERING that that 9/27/16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE 28 is DISCHARGED; Defendants' 9/2/16 MOTION to COMPEL 25 is GRANTED; The deadline for the completion of Discovery in this action is EXTENDED to 11/18/2016. Defendants' request for $495 in sanctions for Plaintiff's repeated failure to appear at her deposition is held in abeyance pending Plaintiff's appearance at her deposition. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/27/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff show cause in writing within fourteen days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution; the Septembe r 30, 2016 hearing of defendants' motion is continued to Friday, October 21, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., at the United States District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California, in Courtroom No. 27, before the undersigned; On or before October 7 , 2016, plaintiff shall file a statement of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' motion; and Plaintiff is cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Becknal, R)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/21/2016 GRANTING 19 Plaintiffs Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Morgan Marie Gomes. (Reader, L)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2016 GRANTING Request to Seal Document(s) re 9 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomes v. Boone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Marie Gomes
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?