October 2, 2018 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/2/2018 ADOPTING IN FULL 130 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 127 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Michel, G.)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2018 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Kasey F. Hoffman at 8:30 a.m. on 10/22/2018 in Courtroom 6. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Henshaw, R)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing
130
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/14/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to consolidate 15-1526 and 1558 for trial 127 be denied. Motion 127 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
126
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/25/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 124 request for disclosure of pretrial conference proceedings. (Yin, K)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
114
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's request to name new witnesses, contained in his supplemental pretrial statement, is GRANTED; the pretrial order is AMENDED to identify the following additional witnesses for plaintiff: Roger Stephens, Dr. Fithian, Monique Agee, Michelle McGee, Keith Stewart, Dena Adams, Michele Spillers, Sergeant Grey, John Minaue and Dean Growden. Plaintiff's request for the court to order the US Marshal to serve su bpoenas on his witnesses, contained in his supplemental pretrial statement, is DENIED. Plaintiff's request to supplement his exhibit list, contained in his supplemental pretrial statement, is GRANTED; the pretrial order is AMENDED to include th e additional exhibits identified by plaintiff in his supplemental pretrial statement. Plaintiff's 112 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. Plaintiff's 113 motion for the US Marshal to serve subpoenas is DENIED. The Clerk shall file UNDER SEAL all exhibits attached to plaintiff's supplemental pretrial statement, i.e., ECF No. 110 at 10-41. (Yin, K)
|
October 3, 2017 |
Filing
101
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/2017 DENYING 97 Motion requesting referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program and scheduled for a settlement conference. (Henshaw, R)
|
September 28, 2017 |
Filing
99
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/12/17 95 are ADOPTED in full; Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment 65 is DENIED. Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 81 is DENIED as to Plaintiff's First Amendment claim against defendant Jones and GRANTED in all other respects. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 12, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/12/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 68 motion for seizure of assets is DENIED; plaintiff's 69 motion for an extension of time to conduct discovery is DENI ED; plaintiff's 73 motion for summary judgment, construed as an opposition to defendants' motion for an extension of time, is DENIED; plaintiff's 84 motion for punitive damages, construed as motion for leave to amend, is DENIE D. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 65 motion for summary judgment be denied; defendants' 81 motion for summary judgment be denied as to plaintiff's First Amendment claim against defendant Jones and granted in all other respects. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/16 denying 60 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's opposition to the videotaped deposition 63 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/16 DENYING 56 Motion for issuance of subpoenas. (Dillon, M)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 53 , 55 requests for subpoenas. (Yin, K)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
52
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 35 motion for a partial settlement. (Yin, K)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/10/16 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/27/16 33 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS (ECF No. 17 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims for damages under RLUIPA; Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS is DENIED in all other respects. Defendants shall file an answer to the complaint within twenty days of the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/27/16 DISREGARDING 28 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff is cautioned that further filing of discovery requests or responses, except as required by rule of court, may result in an order of sanctions, including, but not limited to, a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Dillon, M)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
33
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/16 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 17 ) be granted as to plaintiff's claims for damages under RLUIPA; defendants' motion to dismiss should be denied in all other respects. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
March 15, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/2016 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/29/16 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause for his failure to file an opposition to defendants motion to dismiss; plaintiff shall also file his opposition within that time; failure to respond to this order will result dismissal of this action.(Dillon, M)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/19/2015 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint with 30 days to file a second amended complaint; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a civil rights complaint form.(Yin, K)
|
July 29, 2015 |
Filing
5
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/29/15 ORDERING that Sheriff of Lassen County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Kasey F. Hoffman to the c lerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Lassen County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
|