Johnson v. CMF et al
Plaintiff: Jackie M. Johnson
Defendant: CMF, Partee, A Mazsk, Anderson, S. W. Theard and R. Fox
Case Number: 2:2015cv01609
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/28/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/2/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days from the date of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with a court order. (Zignago, K.)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 04/12/17 ordering the clerk's office shall send plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form. Within 30 days from the date of service of this order, plaintiff must either: a. File a second am ended complaint curing the deficiencies identified by the court in this order, or b. Notify the court in writing that he does not wish to file an amended complaint and he is willing to proceed only on the claim found to be cognizable in this order. (Plummer, M)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/8/2015 ORDERING plaintiff's first amended complaint is deemed timely-filed. Plaintiff's 8 motion for a court order requiring California Medical Facility to make copies is DENIED as moot. (Yin, K)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/7/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Jackie M. Johnson and forward payment to the court until the balance is p aid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. CMF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Mazsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. W. Theard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?