Celtic International, LLC v. J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Celtic International, LLC
Defendant: J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01679
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/22/18: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/26/2018. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2017 ORDERING that discovery cut-off is CONTINUED to 3/2/2018. (Zignago, K.)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/2017 DENYING 12 Motion to Transfer Venue; ORDERING the parties to file within thirty (30) days, a Joint Status Report indicating their readiness to proceed to trial. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celtic International, LLC v. J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celtic International, LLC
Represented By: Hillary Arrow Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?