Chahal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Parmjit Kaur Chahal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv01701
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/1/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($5,000.00), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), subject to the terms of the above-referenced Stipulation. (Becknal, R)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/11/2017 ORDERING 17 that defendant shall file a response to the motion for attorney's fees, not later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 14 days from the date defendant's response is filed. (Reader, L)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; the Commissioner's 14 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this decision. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/16 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief up to and including 5/11/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/1/16: Plaintiff's time to file summary judgment motion is hereby extended from January 29, 2016, to March 4, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chahal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parmjit Kaur Chahal
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?