Perez et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing
Plaintiff: Enrique Perez and Bella Perez
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Case Number: 2:2015cv01708
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 42 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss this aciton without prejudice, signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/4/17. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/26/2016 ORDERING that a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is set for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiffs shall file and serve status reports on or before 10/7/2016, and defendant shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/14/2016. (Jackson, T)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/2/2016 GRANTING 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs' Amended complaint 20 is DISMISSED with leave to amend; Within 28 days from the date of this order, a second amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice. (Reader, L)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/4/16 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss 21 is continued to April 28, 2016; Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, within fourteen days of the date of this or der as to why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion; Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, on or bef ore April 14, 2016; Failure of to file an opposition to the motion will be deemed a statement of non-opposition thereto, and may result in a recommendation that this this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution and/or for failure to comply w ith court orders and this court's Local Rules; Defendant may file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition, if any, on or before April 21, 2016; If plaintiffs wish to proceed on the proposed second amended complaint, plaintiff shall file a motion seeking leave from the court, or notice of the defendant's consent, within fourteen days of the date of this order. (Becknal, R)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/29/2016 GRANTING defendant's request for telephonic appearance at the 3/10/2016 hearing of defendant's motion to dismiss. (Reader, L)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/2015 GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss, re-noticed at ECF. 7 , DISMISSING the 1 Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint within twenty-eight days; CAUTIONING the plaintiffs that a failure to comply with this order in an timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Bradford Ellis Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?