Martinelli v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: JoAnn Martinelli
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and McNeil Nutritionals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01733
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/23/2020 GRANTING 248 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., McNeil Nutritionals, LLC. (Zignago, K.)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/22/2020 SETTING briefing schedule on Defendants' 247 Motion to Decertify the Classes as follows: plaintiff's opposition due 12/2/2020; defendants' reply due 12/23/2020; hearing date set for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Zignago, K.)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/21/2020 ORDERING the Declaration of Larry Martinelli in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena (Dkt. 225 at 21-22) shall be admissible in this case for all purposes, including at trial. (Zignago, K.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION and ORDER ESTABLISHING REMOTE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/2/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/8/20 DENYING 219 Motion to Quash filed by James T Foster and 220 Motion to Quash filed by Larry Martinelli. (Kaminski, H)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/29/2020 EXTENDING Case Schedule: Non-Expert Discovery completed by 9/25/2020; Expert designations and reports due by 11/20/2020; Supplemental designations and reports of expe rts who will express an opinion on a subject covered by an expert designated by an adverse party due by 1/22/2021; Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2021; The parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days afte r receiving the Court's ruling(s) on dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not file dispositive motions, the Parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 2/22/2021; and Other than as stated herein, the Parties will comply with the terms of the Court's 12/20/2019 Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order, Dkt. No. 218 .(Becknal, R)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/28/2019 DENYING 176 , 184 Motions to Exclude and DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 171 Motion to Certify Class. (Huang, H)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/8/2018 GRANTING 203 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Washington, S)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/17/18 GRANTING 196 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. (Benson, A.)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/19/2018 GRANTING 181 Plaintiff's Request to Seal Document(s) and the portions of Renewed Motion for Class Certification. (Reader, L)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/29/18, ORDERING that Exhibits A, C-H to the Declaration of Amanda Villalobos in Support of Defendants' Evidentiary Motion to Exclude; and the 10/2/17 and 1/19/18 Declarations of Dr. Bruce Isaacson, the 10/2/17 and 1/19/18 Declarations of Dr. Denise Martin, and the 10/2/17 and 1/19/18 Declarations of Dr. Scott Swain shall be filed under SEAL for the duration of this litigation or two years from the date of electronic filing of this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/30/18 GRANTING 170 Request to Seal Document. (Kaminski, H)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/9/2018 GRANTING the Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Related Motions set forth in this order. (Fabillaran, J)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/26/2018 VACATING 80 , 83 , 85 , 101 , 102 , 103 , 120 , 121 , 138 Motions; Plaintiff is ordered to refile her Motion for Class Certifications no earlier than 4/1/2018, noticing that motion for 8/9/2018; Parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer and to file a stipulated briefing schedule within 10 days. Additionally, the parties are ORDERED to file a statement with the Court advising when briefing is complete and to submit unredacted copies of all filings and supporting documents. (Fabillaran, J)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/17/2018 ORDERING the Court finds that 132 , 134 , 136 documents at issue should be filed under seal; the Clerk of the Court shall file these documents under SEAL. (Reader, L)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 02/21/18 GRANTING 123 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. (Benson, A.)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2018 GRANTING 123 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Zignago, K.)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/29/2018 GRANTING 110 Defendants Request to Seal Documents in Support of their Reply 111 in Support of 83 the Motion to exclude surveys and expert testimony of J. Michael Dennis, PH.D. (Reader, L)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/11/18 GRANTING 97 Request to Seal Document. (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/2017 ORDERING pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the Scheduling Order previously amended May 5, 2017 (ECF No. 75 ) is further amended as follows; Deadline to Complete Expert Depositions RESET to 12/22/2017; Plaintiff's Deadline to File Class Certification Reply, Daubert Oppositions, and Daubert Motions (if any) RESET to 1/5/2018; Defendants' Deadline to File Daubert Replies RESET to 1/19/2018; Defendants' Deadline to File Daubert Oppositions RESET to 1/26/2018; Plaintiff's Deadline to File Daubert Replies RESET to 2/8/2018; Class Certification and Daubert Hearing TBD. (Becknal, R)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/5/2017 GRANTING 86 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Zignago, K.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/5/2017 GRANTING Request to Seal Documents re 80 Motion to Certify Class. (Michel, G.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/22/17 ORDERING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 45 ) is DENIED and Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification (ECF No. 46 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's California subclass is not affected by this ruling. (Becknal, R)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/4/2017 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Plaintiff's Deadline to Move for Class Certification CONTINUED to 8/28/2017; Defendants' Deadline to Oppose Class Certification CONTINUED to 10/2/2017; Plaintiff's Deadline to File Class Certification Reply CONTINUED to 11/3/2017; Class Certification Hearing CONTINUED to 12/14/2017 at 2:00 PM. (Zignago, K.)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/10/2017 GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 56 Motion to Compel; ORDERING The defendants to meet and confer with the plaintiff, develop a list of additional search terms and additional custodians, conduct an additional search for responsive documents, and produce responsive documents to the plaintiff within twenty-eight days; ORDERING the defendants to produce to the plaintiff within twenty-eight days, a redaction log identifying each redaction, including the redaction of email attachments, and explaining why the information was redacted. (Michel, G.)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/9/2017 ORDERING the defendants to produce the documents from the three new custodians by 2/10/2017; ORDERING that Phase I Discovery be completed by 5/25/2017; ORDERING the p laintiffs to file a Motion for Class Certification by 6/29/2017 and that the hearing on said motion be noticed for hearing on 9/21/2017 at 02:00 PM; ORDERING the defendants to file their opposition to said motion by 7/27/2017; ORDERING that any reply be filed by 8/24/2017. (Michel, G.)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/6/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 66 notice of request to seal (ECF No. 66) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file under seal an unredacted version of the Joint Statement of Discovery Disagreement and Exhibits J-N at pages 123-142 of the Exhibits to the Joint Statement of Discovery Disagreement re Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (Kastilahn, A)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/30/17: Hearing as to 56 MOTION to COMPEL continued to 2/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 2/3/2017, the parties shall file a joint statement re discovery disagreement. On or before 2/3/2017, defendants shall file a statement explaining their failure to contribute to the 1/27/2017 joint statement. Plaintiff's 1/27/2017 request to seal 62 is denied without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/15/16: Hearing as to 45 Motion to deny class certification or, in the alternative, Motion to strike class allegations RESET for 1/12/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/30/16. The Court's Scheduling Order (ECF No. 26 ) is hereby AMENDED to reflect the following dates and deadlines. Phase I Discovery Cut Off due by 2/24/2017. PL deadli ne to File Cert 3/31/2017. DE deadline to Respond 4/28/2017. PL deadline to Reply 5/26/2017. The Court sets the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification for 6/15/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/28/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 29 is granted in part and denied in part. Within thirty days of the date of this order, defendants shall produce responsive documents t o Plaintiff's request for production of documents number 4 and request for production of documents number 23; and Within thirty days of the date of this order, defendants shall produce responsive documents to Plaintiffs request for production of documents numbers 10, 12, 13, 15, 18, 20, 22, 24 and 36, to the extent such documents concern Benecol Spreads' claims that it contained no trans fats or no trans fatty acids. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/10/16 ORDERING that the hearing as to 29 MOTION to COMPEL is CONTINUED to 6/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kastilahn, A)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/13/16, ORDERING that the foregoing 26 Stipulation is hereby ADOPTED by the Court and shall govern the production of electronically stored information and paper documents. (Kastilahn, A)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Stay, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/10/16. (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/13/2016. (Marciel, M)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/15 ORDERING that the time for defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED TO 10/21/15. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinelli v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Martinelli
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil Nutritionals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?